Warren Lamar Ratliff and Bridget Ann Ratliff
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81562 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assign)
doc
05/25/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
05/25/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
Incorrect Event (Notice of) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/29/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
33
07/19/2018
Notice of Withdrawal
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.