Washington v. Equifax Information Services, LLC.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00125 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/30/2018
Notice of Removal
2
05/30/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
05/30/2018
Notice of Appearance
4
05/30/2018
Notice of Service List
5
05/30/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
6
05/30/2018
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
7
06/06/2018
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
8
06/12/2018
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
9
06/21/2018
Remand to State Court
10
06/22/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
11
06/25/2018
Certificate of Service
12
10/16/2018
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
13
11/15/2018
Notice (Other)
14
11/15/2018
Certificate of Service
15
11/16/2018
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
16
12/18/2018
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.