Washington v. Unumprovident Corp., et al
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:2003-cv-01282 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 693 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/31/2003
DEMAND for jury trial by Willie Ruth Washington
2
12/31/2003
NOTICE by UNUMProvident Corp., UNUM Life Ins. Co. to plaintiff's attorney of removal
01/06/2004
File referred to Judge DeMent (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
01/30/2004
MOTION by UNUM Life Ins. Co. to Dismiss, and to Strike plaintiff's demand for punitive and/or extra contractual damages and request for jury trial ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
4
01/30/2004
MOTION by UNUMProvident Corp. to Dismiss ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
5
01/30/2004
MOTION by Willie Ruth Washington to Remand to the Circuit Court of Lowndes County ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
6
01/30/2004
BRIEF by Willie Ruth Washington in support of [5-1] motion to Remand; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
7
01/30/2004
NOTICE of Filing by Willie Ruth Washington of Affidavit of L. Landis Sexton; referred to Judge DeMent
8
02/04/2004
ORDER setting Brief in Response to Motion for defendant to 2/17/04 for [5-1] motion to Remand ; setting Brief in response deadline for plaintiff to 2/29/04 regarding [4-1] motion to Dismiss, [3-1] motion to Dismiss, and [3-2] motion to Strike; setting reply brief deadline for 3/10/04 for Mariner Post Acute, for UNUM Life Ins. Co., for UNUMProvident Corp., for Willie Ruth Washington ; setting [5-1] motion to Remand, [4-1] motion to Dismiss, [3-1] motion to Dismiss, and [3-2] motion to Strike for submission on 3/10/04 (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies provided to counsel.
9
02/19/2004
MOTION by UNUM Life Ins. Co. to Stay ruling on remand pending limited discovery ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
11
02/19/2004
BRIEF by UNUM Life Ins. Co. in opposition to [5-1] motion to Remand (w/exhibitis 1-4); referred to Judge Ira De Ment
12
03/01/2004
NOTICE of Filing by Willie Ruth Washington of affidavit of Willie Ruth Washington (w/affidavit); referred to Judge DeMent
13
03/01/2004
RESPONSE by Willie Ruth Washington to [4-1] motion to Dismiss by UNUMProvident Corp., [3-1] motion to Dismiss by UNUM Life Ins. Co., [3-2] motion to Strike by UNUM Life Ins. Co., [10-1] motion to Strike by UNUM Life Ins. Co., and brief in opposition to [5-1] motion to Remand by Willie Ruth Washington (w/attachment); referred to Judge Ira De Ment
14
03/04/2004
ORDER directing plaintiff to Show Cause on or before 03/17/04 why [10-1] motion to Strike, and [9-1] motion to Stay should not be granted (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies provided to counsel.
15
03/17/2004
RESPONSE by Willie Ruth Washington in opposition to [10-1] motion to Strike [7-1] notice of filing of affidavit of Willie Ruth Washington by UNUM Life Ins. Co. and [9-1] motion to Stay ruling on remand pending limited discovery by UNUM Life Ins. Co. (Exhibits A & B attached) referred to Judge Ira De Ment
16
09/10/2004
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 5 Motion to Remand; granting plaintiff leave until 09/24/04 to amend her complaint to state cause(s) of action under ERISA; granting 10 Motion to Strike; denying as moot without prejudice 3 Motion to Dismiss state law claims and 3 Motion to Strike jury demand and allowing renewal against any amended complaint. Signed by Judge Ira De Ment on 09/10/04.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
17
09/10/2004
ORDER granting 4 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice; dismissing defendant UNUM Provident Corp. Signed by Judge Ira De Ment on 09/10/04.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
18
09/10/2004
ORDER denying as moot 9 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Ira De Ment on 09/10/04.
09/20/2004
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Orders of 09/10/04 sent to Arthur F. Ray II returned with the following notation, "Returned to Sender, Forward Time Expired" (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
11/02/2004
ORDER dismissing this cause of action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Ira De Ment on 11/02/04.
20
11/02/2004
FINAL JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiff, and that plaintiff take nothing by her said suit; taxing costs herein incurred against plaintiff, for which let execution issue. Signed by Judge Ira De Ment on 11/02/04.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.