Wassillie v. Jabaay
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00178 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/01/2018
Complaint
2
08/01/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
08/01/2018
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
4
08/01/2018
Appoint Counsel
5
08/01/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA 23
10/16/2018
Filing Fee Received (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
08/01/2018
Unissued Summons
7
10/29/2018
Order
8
11/16/2018
Order
9
12/14/2018
Extension of Time to Amend
10
12/14/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
11
01/10/2019
Amended Complaint
12
01/22/2019
Notice of Change of Address
13
02/07/2019
Order
14
03/05/2019
Amended Complaint
15
03/14/2019
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
16
03/15/2019
Judgment
17
04/17/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
18
04/18/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.