Waterbury v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00185 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/14/2018
Complaint
2
08/14/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
08/14/2018
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
4
08/14/2018
Declaration
08/15/2018
Order on Motion to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
08/14/2018
Unissued Summons
6
08/14/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
8
08/15/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
08/15/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
09/11/2018
Notice of Appearance
10
09/12/2018
Scheduling Order
09/12/2018
Docket Annotation re Opening Brief (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
10/31/2018
Notice of Appearance
12
11/09/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
13
11/09/2018
Declaration
14
11/14/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
15
12/13/2018
Dismiss
16
12/28/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
17
02/26/2019
Order on Motion to Dismiss
18
03/11/2019
Response to Order to Show Cause
19
03/13/2019
Order
20
03/14/2019
Judgment
21
05/20/2019
Stipulation
22
05/21/2019
Order on Stipulation

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.