Watson Animal Clinic, et al v. Copelco Capital Inc., et al
Court Docket Sheet

2:1996-cv-00781 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 543 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/08/1996
DEMAND for jury trial by Watson Animal Clinic, William Herschel Watson (dkt clerk)
2
05/08/1996
NOTICE to circuit court clerk of filing notice of removal by Copelco Capital Inc. (dkt clerk)
3
05/08/1996
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of notice of removal by Copelco Capital Inc. on Circuit Court Clerk and opposing counsel. (dkt clerk)
05/13/1996
File referred to Judge De Ment. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
10/30/1996
Received certified copy of conditional transfer order from Clerk, U.S. District Court, Middle District of Florida. (dkt clerk)
10/30/1996
Case closed (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/1996
Entire file with certified copy of docket entries mailed by cmrrr to Clerk, U.S. District Court, Middle District of Florida. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/1996
Received return receipt card indicating entire file received by Clerk, U.S. District Court, Middle District of Florida on 11/4/96. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
05/02/2002
Original file, certified copy of remand order and docket sheet received from the Middle District of Florida. (dkt clerk)
05/02/2002
Case reopened as to remand order filed on 5/2/02. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/07/2002
File referred to Judge De Ment. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/05/2002
CASE reassigned to Judge Myron H. Thompson (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2002
CASE reassigned to Judge W. H. Albritton III (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/10/2002
MOTION by Watson Animal Clinic, William Herschel Watson for Lowell Landis Sexton to Withdraw as Attorney referred to Judge W. H. Albritton III
7
10/11/2002
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Watson Animal Clinic and William Herschel Watson by Michael Guy Holton referred to Judge Albritton. (dkt clerk)
8
10/18/2002
Stamped ORDER granting [6-1] motion for Lowell Landis Sexton to Withdraw as Attorney (by Judge W. H. Albritton III), copies provided to counsel. (dkt clerk)
12/02/2002
CASE reassigned to Judge Mark E. Fuller (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
12/06/2002
** NOTICE of CASE reassigned to Judge Mark E. Fuller, copies provided.
10
12/13/2002
Stipulation of Dismissal treated as a MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 41(a)(2)
11
03/04/2003
ORDER directing parties file appropriate submissions in accordance with the requirements of FRCP 41 by March 14, 2003 should they still wish to have this case dismissed (signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller), copies provided to counsel.
12
03/13/2003
MOTION by Copelco Capital Inc. to Extend Time to respond to the court's order of 3/4/03 ; referred to Judge Mark E. Fuller
13
03/18/2003
ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the court's order of 3/4/03 (signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller), copies provided to counsel.
14
03/20/2003
Implementation of STIPULATION of dismissal. Referred to Judge Fuller
15
03/27/2003
ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Dismiss under Rule 41(a)(2) to the extent that (1) in light of the Fourth Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization, etc. (the "Plan") in the actions styled In re Optical Technologies, Inc., et al, United States Bankruptcy Court for the Middle District of Florida Case Nos. 96-805-8P1, 96-1200-8P1, 96-1201-8P1, 96-1202-8P1, 96-1203-8P1, 98-20134-8P1, 98-20135-8P1 and 98-20136-8P1, the Order of Bankruptcy Judge Paskay confirming the Plan, and payment by Watson Animal Clinic, Inc. and Dr. William Herschel Watson to Copelco, all claims and counterclaims asserted by plaintiffs and/or defendant Copelco against one another are DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. (2) all claims by plaintiff against Mr. Harper are DISMISSED without prejudice; a separate judgment shall issue (signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller), copies provided to counsel.
16
03/27/2003
FINAL JUDGMENT; Ordered that (1) as to all claims and counterclaims between Plaintiffs and Defendant Copelco, this action is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs; (2) as to all claims asserted by plaintiff against Jud Harper, this action is dismissed without prejudice; (3) all pending motions are denied as MOOT; the Clerk of Court is directed to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP. (signed by Judge Mark E. Fuller), copies provided to counsel.
03/27/2003
Case closed (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.