Wayne Coleman Willis and Lira Dimatulac Willis
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00091 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
12
06/05/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
13
06/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
06/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
06/11/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
16
06/11/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
17
06/12/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
18
06/18/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
19
06/18/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
20
06/20/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
06/21/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
06/21/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
22
06/21/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
23
06/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
24
06/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
25
06/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
07/05/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
27
07/12/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
28
07/12/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
29
07/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
30
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
31
08/16/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
32
08/17/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
33
08/17/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
08/17/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
08/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.