Wayson v. McGrady
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00163 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/12/2018
Notice of Removal
2
07/12/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
07/12/2018
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
4
07/17/2018
Jury Demand
5
07/18/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
6
07/18/2018
Notice (Other)
7
07/18/2018
Remand to State Court
8
07/23/2018
Notice of Service List
9
07/25/2018
Strike
10
08/01/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
11
08/01/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
12
08/01/2018
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
13
08/01/2018
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
14
08/01/2018
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
15
08/01/2018
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
16
08/01/2018
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
17
08/01/2018
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
18
08/06/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
19
08/06/2018
Response in Support of Motion
20
09/17/2018
Compel
21
10/10/2018
Notice (Other)
22
10/17/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
23
10/30/2018
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
24
11/09/2018
Reconsideration
25
11/15/2018
Supplement
26
11/19/2018
Order
27
12/12/2018
Response to Order
12/12/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
12/17/2018
Supplement
12/17/2018
Order Referring Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
01/04/2019
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
01/04/2019
Order Reassigning Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
Order Reassigning Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
Order of Recusal (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
02/22/2019
Summary Judgment
35
02/25/2019
Notice (Other)
36
03/01/2019
Notice (Other)
37
03/13/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
38
03/13/2019
Affidavit
39
03/13/2019
Notice (Other)
40
03/14/2019
Affidavit
41
03/26/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
42
04/16/2019
Order
43
04/19/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
44
04/26/2019
Order on Motion to Compel
45
04/29/2019
Supplement
46
04/29/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
47
05/01/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
48
05/03/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
49
05/03/2019
Supplement
50
05/08/2019
Scheduling Order
51
05/08/2019
Trial Management Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.