Weaver v. Berryhill
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00176 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 319 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/17/2017
COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Angela Gay Weaver.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
2
08/17/2017
Civil Cover Sheet
3
08/17/2017
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angela Gay Weaver.
4
08/17/2017
Unissued summons re Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill
1
Unissued Summons re Defendant USAG
2
Unissued Summons re Defendant USAO
2 Attachments
5
08/18/2017
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney Edward A. Wicklund. (Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2377481.) by Angela Gay Weaver.
1
Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
6
08/30/2017
ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: The Application to Waive the Filing Fee, at docket 3, is granted. Service of Process to be completed within 90 days of the date of Complaint. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 8/29/17.
08/30/2017
Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
08/31/2017
RRB TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney filed by Attorney Edward A. Wicklund at Docket 5 is hereby GRANTED. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
8
09/05/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Pomeroy on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill
11
10/31/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Burdett on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill
12
10/31/2017
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Nancy A. Berryhill.
13
10/31/2017
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record
1
Certification Page 09-30-2017
2
Court Transcript Index 09-30-2017
3
Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable 08-21-2015
4
Payment Documents and Decisions 08-21-2015
5
Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 08-21-2015
6
Non Disability Related Development 08-21-2015
7
Disability Related Development 08-21-2015
8
Medical Records 08-21-2015 Part 1
9
Medical Records 08-21-2015 Part 2
10
Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable 09-30-2017
11
Payment Documents and Decisions 09-30-2017
12
Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 09-30-2017
13
Non Disability Related Development 09-30-2017
14
Disability Related Development 09-30-2017
15
Medical Records 09-30-2017 Part 1
16
Medical Records 09-30-2017 Part 2
17
Medical Records 09-30-2017 Part 3
18
Medical Records 09-30-2017 Part 4
19
Medical Records 09-30-2017 Part 5
20
Medical Records 09-30-2017 Part 6
21
Medical Records 09-30-2017 Part 7
22
Medical Records 09-30-2017 Part 8
23
Medical Records 09-30-2017 Part 9
24
Medical Records 09-30-2017 Part 10
25
Medical Records 09-30-2017 Part 11
26
Medical Records 09-30-2017 Part 12
27
Medical Records 09-30-2017 Part 13
28
Medical Records 09-30-2017 Part 14
28 Attachments
14
11/27/2017
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief by Angela Gay Weaver.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
15
11/30/2017
RRB TEXT ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff's opening brief in this matter is due on or before 12/30/2017. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
16
01/02/2018
MOTION Reversal and Remand in a Social Security Appeal by Angela Gay Weaver.
17
02/01/2018
MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Brief) by Nancy A. Berryhill.
18
02/15/2018
Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by Angela Gay Weaver.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.