Welton v. Gilligan
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cv-00149 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
47
07/18/2018
~Util - Set Hearings
08/01/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
12/10/2018
ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS: Respondents Motion to Dismiss at Docket 29 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter a final judgment accordingly. The Court further finds that Ms. Welton has not made the requisite substantial show ing of the denial of a constitutional right, and therefore a certificate of appealability will not be issued by this Court. Ms. Welton may request a certificate of appealability from the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/07/2018.
50
12/10/2018
Judgment
51
12/12/2018
Reconsideration
52
12/13/2018
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
12/13/2018
Docket Annotation re Opening Brief (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
01/10/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
01/10/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
02/11/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
02/12/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
03/08/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
58
03/11/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.