Wendi Adams Shaw
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04785 (alnb)

Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, in addition to Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay, Filed by Creditor 21st Mortgage Corporation

UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA passionat IN RE: WENDI ADAMS SHAW CHAPTER 13 SS # XXX - XX - 4581 DEBTOR (S) $ CASE NO. BK 17 - 04785 - TOM13 အ အ အ အ သာ 21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATIONS MOVANT (S) VS. WENDI ADAMS SHAW AND con con con con con can con con con con con con can con con con ANNA M. ADAMS SHAW AND BRADFORD W. CARAWAY, CHAPTER 13 TRUSTEE RESPONDENT (S) MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM STAY AND CO - DEBTOR STAY BY 21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION COMES NOW 21st Mortgage Corporation, (hereinafter " Movant"), a secured creditor in the above bankruptcy proceeding and moves this Honorable Court to enter an Order granting relief from Section 362 (d) and 1301 (c) of the United States Bankruptcy Code to Movant so as to permit recovery of the collateral securing its claim and as grounds for said Motion states as follows: 1. Movant is a secured creditor in the above referenced Chapter 13 proceeding. 2. The Debtor financed the purchase of a 2016 Tru 14 ' x 76 ' Manufactured Home, VIN # SA4071041AL through Movant. Movant has a security interest in this Manufactured Home as evidenced by the documents attached hereto as Exhibit " A " and incorporated herein by reference. Case 17 - 04785 - TOM13 Doc 32 Filed 02 / 12 / 18 Entered 02 / 12 / 18 16: 09: 29 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 13 3. There is a co - debtor (Anna M. Adams Shaw) on the obligation evidenced by Movant's proof of claim and which is made the subject of this motion. 4. Movant will be irreparably harmed and injured by the continuation of the co a debtor's stay. 5. The Debtor's plan, as confirmed, calls for direct payments to Movant which are due for December 15, 2017, and subsequent months through the filing of this Motion. 6. Based on the forgoing, Movant asserts that it is not adequately protected, and unless Movant is granted relief from the automatic stay so as to repossess and dispose of the collateral, Movant will suffer irreparable harm and injury. WHEREFORE, Movant moves this Honorable Court: A. Enter an Order granting to Movant relief under 11U.S. C. Section 362 (d) and Section 1301 (c) so as to permit Movant to pursue its state court remedies, repossess and dispose of the collateral securing its claim in accordance with its security agreement and the Uniform Commercial Code and thereafter amend its claim for the deficiency which may thereafter remain. B. Make an award to Movant for legal fees and costs associated with this Motion in the amount of $ 681. 00. C. Movant further prays that upon final hearing of this Motion that the stay will be lifted automatically and that the fourteen (14) day waiting period of Rule 4001 (a) (3) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure be waived. D. Movant prays for such other and further relief to which it may be entitled. Date: February 12, 2018 / s / Kristofor D. Sodergren Kristofor D. Sodergren (SODEK - 0591) Attorney for 21st Mortgage Corporation File No. 53504. 203 Case No. BK 17 - 04785 - TOM13 Page 2 Case 17 - 04785 - TOM13 Doc 32 Filed 02 / 12 / 18 Entered 02 / 12 / 18 16: 09: 29 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 13 OF COUNSEL ROSEN & HARWOOD, P. A. 2200 Jack Warner Parkway, Suite 200 Post Office Box 2727 Tuscaloosa, Alabama 35403 Telephone: (205) 344 - 5000 ksodergren @ rosenharwood. com CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE This is to certify that I have this day served the foregoing upon the following: By depositing a copy of same in a pre - addressed, stamped envelope with adequate postage prepaid thereon and properly addressed to the following: Wendi Adams Shaw Debtor 100 Madison Drive Trussville, AL 35173 Anna M. Adams Shaw Co - Maker 100 Madison Drive Trussville, AL 35173 via the Court's Electronic mailing service (CM / ECF): Bradford W. Caraway (kmitchell @ ch13bham. com via CM / ECF Noticing Services) Chapter 13 Trustee P. 0. Drawer 10848 Birmingham, AL 35202 Brent William Davis (brentſ @ brentwdavis. com via CM / ECF Noticing Services) Attorney for Debtor 2700 Rogers Drive, Suite 106 Homewood, AL 35209 This the 12th day of February, 2018. e / s / Kristofor D. Sodergren Kristofor D. Sodergren (SODEK - 0591) Of Counsel for 21st Mortgage Corporation Case No. BK 17 - 04785 - TOM13 Page 3 Case 17 - 04785 - TOM13 Doc 32 Filed 02 / 12 / 18 Entered 02 / 12 / 18 16: 09: 29 Desc Main Document Page 3 of 13 STATE OF TENNESSEE 8 AFFIDAVIT OF cos com com COUNTY OF KNOX SANDRA BRANDON Before me, the undersigned authority, personally appeared Sandra Brandon, hereinafter referred to as Affiant, who being known to me and being first duly sworn, deposes and says as follows: 1. My name is Sandra Brandon and I am employed by 21st Mortgage Corporation (hereinafter " Movant") . I have personal knowledge of the facts stated herein, and I am custodian of any records attached hereto. I have a personal understanding of how the books, records and computer systems relating to loan servicing at Movant function and how they relate to the bankruptcy proceeding filed by Wendi Adams Shaw (hereinafter " Debtor") . Among my responsibilities as an employee of Movant is to monitor the processing of payments and other requirements of the Debtor under the terms of the Consumer Loan Note, Security Agreement and Disclosure Statement. 2. The Debtor executed a Consumer Loan Note, Security Agreement and Disclosure Statement (hereinafter " Contract") to Movant in the principal amount of $ 29, 538. 86 on July 15, 2016, which is secured by personal property being more particularly described in Movant's Motion for Relief and Co - Debtor Stay on file and as evidenced by the Contract and in Movant's Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay and Co - Debtor Stay filed contemporaneously therewith. Movant is the current holder of said Contract. True and correct copies of the Contract and the Certificate of Title evidencing the perfection of Movant's security interest in the personal property are attached to the Motion for Relief from Stay and Co - Debtor Stay as Exhibit " A " . As of March 2, 2018, the aggregate amount due and owing Movant under the terms of the contract is $ 33, 070. 49. Debtor's Schedule D lists the current value of Debtor's interest in the property as $ 25, 000. 00. The subject note with Movant bears a rate of interest as provided therein. 3. The Debtor has not paid the Post - petition installments due directly to Movant in the amount of $ 368. 26 per month for the months of December 15, 2017 through January 15, 2018, for a total post petition default of $ 736. 52. Movant will incur additional attorney fees and costs for this motion. 4. The information contained herein and in the attached Exhibits is based upon business records that Movant keeps in the ordinary course of its business, made at or near the time of the facts stated thereby, which Movant keeps, maintains and generates as part of its ordinary course of business. All of the above statements are true and correct and stated as facts based upon my own personal knowledge. SIAM UMA DUAndM AFFIANT 21st Mortgage Corporation SWORN TO and SUBSCRIBED before me on this the day of February, 2018. Marula, na 1111111111 A 80 Notary Public My Commission Expires: S. STATE 3 OF: ATAS SSLE 1: 4imirili 11111111111, TENNESSEE O NOTARY O - PUBLICI 111111111111, ir. KNON 11111111111 VOX COM " 11111111111 UNTY IMUS11111 Case 17 - 04785 - TOM13 Doc 32 Filed 02 / 12 / 18 Entered 02 / 12 / 18 16: 09: 29 Desc Main Document Page 4 of 13 How KA 44. Iyult. u STATEMENT Do not close before 7 / 15 / 2016 LENDER: 21st Mortgage Corp. 620 Market St. Suite 100 Knoxville, TN 37902 NMLS No. 2280 Reference No Borrower's Name: Wendi R Shaw. Co - Borrower's Name: Anna M Adams Shaw Borrower's Address: 600 Margin Rd, Trussville, AL 35173 Co - Borrower's Address: 600 Margin Rd, Trussville, AL 35173 In this Consumer Loan Note ("Note"), " Borrower " refers to all persons who sign this Note as " Barrower " and " Co - Borrower ", jointly and severally. " Lender " refers to 21st Mortgage Corporation ("21st Mortgage"), and its successors and assigns. Other capitalized terms are defined in the disclosures on this page and in the section of this Note titled, " Itemization of Amount Financed. " Borrower promises to advise Lender in writing of any change of Borrower's mailing address while this Note is in effect. Lender should send any papers or notices concerning this Note to Borrower's mailing address. On the date of this Note, Borrower finances with Lender the manufactured home described below, together with the related services, furnishings, equipment, appliances and accessories included with the manufactured home (collectively, " Manufactured Home") . Description of Manufactured Home: A New Dused MANUFACTURER: CMH TRU YEAR: 2016 APPROX. LENGTH: 76 APPROX. WIDTH: 14 мH SERIAL NO. SA4071041AL SERIAL NO. SERIAL NO. SERIAL NO. SERIAL NO, SERIAL NO. PROMISE TO PAY: Borrower promises to pay Lender the " Unpald Balance " as listed under the " Itemization of Amount Financed " plus interest. When Borrower signs this Note, borrower will also pay Lender any " Prepaid Finance Charge " shown in the " Itemization of Amount Financed. " Borrower authorizes Lender to include the Prepaid Finance Charges in the Unpaid Balance. Lender will compute and charge interest on the unpaid amount of the Unpaid Balance from the Note date at the yearly rate of 9. 750 % (the " Note Rate") . When Lender calculates interest, every year shall have 360 days and every month shall have 30 days. Borrower promises to pay interest at the Note Rate on the unpaid amount of the Unpaid Balance of this Note until it is paid in full. Interest after the final scheduled maturity date on this Note, however, shall not exceed the maximum rate allowed by state law. Borrower's Payment Schedule will be: Number of Payments Amount of Payments When Payments Are Due 180 $ 312. 92 Monthly, beginning 8 / 15 / 2016 BORROWER FURTHER PROMISES to pay Lender monthly payments in the number and amounts of payments shown in Borrower's Payment Schedule. Borrower's first payment will be due on the first date shown in Borrower's Payment Schedule, and subsequent payments will be due on the same day of each month after that. LENDER WILL APPLY EACH PAYMENT RECEIVED AS OF ITS SCHEDULED DUE DATE. If on the final scheduled payment due date, Borrower still owes amounts under this Note, Borrower will pay those amounts in full on that date (the " Maturity Date") . Borrower will make all payments to 21st Mortgage Corp ., 620 Market St. Suite 100, Knoxville, Tennessee 37902, or any other address to which Lender directs Borrower to send Borrower's payments. SECURITY INTEREST: To secure payment of all sums due or which become due under this Note, and Borrower's performance of all other terms of the Note, Borrower grants Lender a first priority security Interest in (1) the Manufactured Home, and all accessions, attachments, accessories, replacements and additions to the Manufactured Home, whether added now or later; (2) the " Property " described in any mortgage or deed of trust Borrower gives to Lender; (3) Borrower's rights to refunds of premiums for and payments under, and proceeds of any insurance or any extended warranty or service contract purchased with the proceeds of this Note; (4) any amounts held in escrow by Lender for Borrower; and, (5) proceeds and products of all of the foregoing (collectively, the " Collateral") . Lender's security interest shall remain in effect until Borrower pays, in full, all amounts due under the Note. Despite any other provision of the Note, however, Lender is not granted, and does not have, a non - purchase money security interest in household goods, to the extent such a security interest is prohibited by applicable law. Borrower will pay any filing or recording fees necessary for Lender to obtain and hold a first priority security interest. To the extent allowed by law, Borrower also agrees to pay any release, discharge or termination fees, after the Borrower pays the Note in full. Borrower agrees to execute any application for certificate of title or ownership, financing statement or other document necessary to perfect Lender's security interest in the Manufactured Home. Borrower authorizes Lender to sign Borrower's name to any financing statement or application or other document necessary to perfect the security interest granted by Borrower herein. If Lender is taking a security interest in real property, such interest is reflected in a mortgage or deed of trust signed in conjunction with this Note. AMAS EXHIBIT Borrowers Initials NV > Co - Borrower's initials 21st Mortgage Corporation NMLS # 2280 · 620 Market Street, Suite 100, Knoxville, TN 37902 1 - 800 - 955 - 0021 · www. 21stmortgage. com • Karen Mulryan NMLS # 1087868 AL Version 2 / 5 / 2016 tabbies Case 17 - 04785 - TOM13 Doc 32 Filed 02 / 12 / 18 Entered 02 / 12 / 18 16: 09, 9 Desc Main Document Page 5 of 13 TRUTH IN LENDING DISCLOSURES ANNUAL FINANCE PERCENTAGE CHARGE RATE The dollar amount the credit | The cost of Borrower's credit as al will cost Borrower. yearly rate, 10. 261 % $ 27, 634. 56 Amount Financed The amount of credit provided to Borrower or on Borrower's behalf. Total of Payments The amount Borrower will have paid should Borrower make all payments as scheduled. $ 28, 691. 04 $ 56, 325. 60 INTEREST RATE AND PAYMENT SUMMARY Interest Rate Principal + Interest Payment Est, Taxes + Insurance (Escrow) Total Est. Monthly Payment Rate & Monthly Payment 9. 750 % $ 312, 92 $ 55, 34 $ 368. 26 | Security: Borrower gives Lender a security Interest in: * The Manufactured Home, which will be located at 100 Madison Dr, Trussville, AL 35173 | Late Charge: If a payment is more than 15 days late, Borrower will be charged 5 % of the amount of such payment, not to exceed $ 100. 00. Other references in this Note to the " Late Charge " refer to the amount shown in the Delinquency and Default Section below. Prepayment: If Borrower pays off early, Borrower will not have to pay a penalty. Assumption: Someone buying the Manufactured Home may be allowed to assume the remainder of Borrower's obligations under this Note on the original terms only if such person is approved by Lender. other Information: Refer to the rest of this Note for additional information about nonpayment, default, any required payment in full before the scheduled date and prepayment refunds and penalties. MDIA Refinancing Warning: There is no guarantee that Borrower will be able to refinance the loan to obtain a lower interest rate and / or payment, PROPERTY INSURANCE PROPERTY INSURANCE ON THE MANUFACTURED HOME IS REQUIRED FOR THE TERM OF THIS NOTE, BORROWER HAS THE RIGHT TO OBTAIN SUCH INSURANCE FROM ANYONE AUTHORIZED BY LAW TO SELL IT AND IS REASONABLY ACCEPTABLE TO | LENDER. Borrower elects to finance through Lender the below listed property insurance of the specified type, term and premium. Hazard Insurance Provider Term Premium | 21st Insurance 12 MONTHS $ 635. 00 * A separate flood or wind insurance policy may or may not be reflected in the information above or financed as part of the loan. | Borrower should refer to the appropriate insurance policy documents for more details. Borrower's signature below indicates Borrower's election to finance the above listed property insurance for the type, term and premium shown. Guy (| Wendi R Shaw Date Anna M Adams Shaw Datev | X AC ISI, IL XOM THIS SPACE LEFT INTENTIONALLY BLANK E Borrower's initials Co - Borrowers initials Aw " 21st Mortgage Corporation NMLS # 2280 · 620 Market Street, Suite 100, Knoxville, TN 37902 1 - 800 - 955 - 0021 - www. 21stmortgage. com » Karen Mulryan NMLS # 1087868 SAMAS AL Version 2 / 5 / 2016 Page 2 of 8 Case 17 - 04785 - TOM13 Doc 32 Filed 02 / 12 / 18 Entered 02 / 12 / 18 16: 09: 29 Desc Main Document Page 6 of 13 awan - " Paname. TYTTA AFERY AMA ITEMIZATION OF AMOUNT FINANCED: 1. Cash Price a. Manufactured Home * * $ 28, 402. 32 b. Sales Tax $ 1, 065. 09 c. Total Cash Price (1a plus 1b) $ 29, 467. 41 2. Down Payment a. Cash Down Payment $ 1, 473. 37 6. Net Trade - in Allowance Trade - in Length: width: Liens: c. Other Credits: d. Total Down Payment (2a plus 2b plus 2c) $ 1, 473. 37 | 3. Unpaid Cash Price for Purchase or Refinance a. Unpaid Portion of Cash Price (1c minus 2d) OR $ 27, 994. 04 b. For a Refinanced Loan, Amount Paid to Others · 4. Amounts paid to others on Borrower's behalf a. To Insurance Companies * * I. Property Insurance * * $ 635. 00 b. To Public Officials I. Certificate of Title $ 20. 00 li. Filing / Recording Fees * * c. Appraisal Fee $ 42. 00 Total of All Amounts ((a) through (c)) $ 697. 00 5. Prepaid Finance Charges (includes items paid to third parties; items may be financed in part and paid in cash in part) a. Financed i. Origination Points / Fee $ 839. 82 li. Flood Determination / Monitoring Fee $ 8. 00 b. Paid in Cash | 6. Unpaid Balance (3 + 4 + 5 { a }) $ 29, 538. 86 7. Prepaid Finance Charges (total of all items in 5) $ 847. 82 | 8. Armount Financed (6 minus 7) $ 28, 691. 04 * * Lender may retain, or receive, a portion of these amounts | Security interest termination, release, discharge or satisfaction fees paid upon termination will vary based upon applicable law. This | fee is not paid by Borrower at closing. THIS SPACE LEFT INTENTIONALLY BLANK L E Borrower's initials Wn Co - Borrowers Initials A 21st Mortgage Corporation NMLS # 2280 - 620 Market Street, Suite 100, Knoxvile, TN 37902 1 - 800 - 955 - 0021 - www. 21stmortgage. com • Karen Mulryan NMLS # 1087868 AL Version 2 / 5 / 2016 Page 3 of 8 Case 17 - 04785 - TOM13 Doc 32 Filed 02 / 12 / 18 Entered 02 / 12 / 18 16: 09: 29 Desc Main Document Page 7 of 13 LIV TILA NA AFIRI VITIAS BORROWER'S RIGHT TO PREPAY: BORROWER MAY PREPAY ANY AMOUNTS DUE UNDER THIS NOTE AT ANY TIME WITHOUT OWER PENALTY. A Principal only payment is known as a " Prepayment. " Lender will not treat a payment as a Prepayment unless Borrower previously made all monthly payments of principal and interest and fully paid and satisfied all other obligations due under this Note. If Borrower meets these conditions, Borrower may make a Prepayment by sending such Prepayment in accordance with the instructions provided by Lender in a monthly billing statement, or payment coupon, or otherwise as directed by Lender, Borrower may make a full Prepayment or partial Prepayments without paying a Prepayment charge. If Borrower (1) prepays this Note in full, or (2) defaults and fails to cure the default and Lender demands payment of the entire balance due on this Note, no portion of any Prepaid Finance Charge will be refunded. All Prepaid Finance Charges are earned at the time this Note is made. PROPERTY INSURANCE: Borrower is required to insure the Manufactured Home against physical damage, including loss by fire, hazards included within the term " extended coverage, " and any other hazards for which Lender requires insurance, for the term of the Note at Borrower's expense. If Borrower financed the premium, the premium is financed over the term of the Note, even though the term of insurance is less than the Note term. The Borrower must obtain the types and amounts of insurance coverage required by Lender, including flood insurance if applicable. The insurance policy must contain a loss payable clause protecting Lender (as Lender's interest may appear), and provide for at least a 10 day notice of cancellation to Lender. Borrower agrees to provide written proof of such coverage to Lender within 5 days of Lender's request. BORROWER HAS THE RIGHT TO CHOOSE THE ENTITY THROUGH WHICH THE PROPERTY INSURANCE IS OBTAINED. Lender reserves the right to refuse to accept, for reasonable cause, an insurer chosen by the Borrower. If Borrower's insurance coverage expires or is canceled prior to payment in full of this Note, Borrower must obtain coverage in the amounts, types, and for the periods that Lender requires at Borrower's expense for the remaining term of the Note. Lender's property insurance coverage requirements can change during the term of the Note. Should Borrower fail to provide or maintain property insurance or fail to provide Lender with satisfactory evidence of coverage, or should the property insurance, for any reason, not protect Lender's interests, Lender, in its sole discretion, may obtain property insurance that meets its requirements, including Insurance that may protect both Buyer's and Seller's interests, but is under no legal obligation to do so. Before obtaining insurance in these circumstances, Lender will, in good faith, attempt to inform Borrower in writing of the need for Borrower to obtain property insurance and / or to provide evidence thereof. If obtained by Lender, Lender will add the cost of the insurance to the amount due under the Note. That amount will become due and payable upon demand by the Lender, in payments added to Borrower's scheduled payments, or as otherwise required by Lender. Lender may charge Borrower interest on such cost at the Note Rate, unless prohibited by applicable law. The property insurance obtained by Lender may have material differences from insurance initially financed under the Note or from insurance obtained by the Borrower initially or at any time during the term of the Note. Such insurance may be significantly more expensive to Borrower than it Borrower obtained the insurance, Consequently, Lender makes the following disclosures to Borrower: (a) The property insurance that Lender obtains is intended solely to protect the Lender's interest hereunder, and Lender may not obtain coverages beyond those to insure loss of or damage to the Manufactured Home; in particular, such insurance may not provide coverage for personal effects, adjacent structures, medical expenses or personal liability; additionally, such coverage may not insure the Manufactured Home in an amount equal to the Unpaid Balance due under this Note and, consequently, in the event of loss or damage, the insurance may not pay the full amount of the Unpaid Balance of the Note: (b) If Lender obtains this insurance due to Borrower default, Borrower acknowledges and agrees that Lender has no duty to obtain insurance on behalf of Borrower which is the least expensive, or which has a competitive marketplace premium or any other particular feature or special benefit; (C) Lender or its affiliates may be reimbursed for expenses and may profit from taking action to cure Borrower's default by providing and maintaining such insurance; (d) Borrower's execution of this Note authorizes Lender to provide third parties with any Information necessary to obtain insurance on the Manufactured Home and monitor the status of such insurance; and (e) Borrower may, as stated above, at any time, including after Lender obtains property insurance on Borrower's behalf, obtain insurance through an agent or insurer of Borrower's choice. Upon so doing, Borrower may provide Lender with sufficient evidence of insurance coverage, at which time, Lender will cancel the insurance coverage it obtained on Borrower's behalf, obtain any refund due on the unearned portion of the premium, and apply the refund to the Unpaid Balance of the Note. Property insurance proceeds (whether such insurance has been obtained by Borrower or Lender) shall be applied to the restoration or repair of the Manufactured Home, if it is economically feasible and does not lessen the Lender's security interest in the Manufactured Home. If this is not the case, or if the Insurer determines that the Manufactured Home represents a total loss under the coverage, Lender will apply such insurance proceeds to reduce all amounts owing under this Note, whether or not such amounts are due and payable. Borrower authorizes Lender to (a) adjust or settle Borrower's claim for loss under such insurance; (b) sign Borrower's name to any check, draft or other documents necessary to obtain such insurance proceeds; and (c) hold such insurance proceeds until Lender has the opportunity to inspect the Manufactured Home and ensure that work to restore or repair the Manufactured Home is completed to Lender's satisfaction, without incurring an obligation to pay Borrower earnings or Interest on such proceeds. Lender may disburse proceeds in a single payment or a series of payments and Borrower authorizes any insurer to make such payment directly to Lender. If insurance proceeds paid to Lender do not satisfy all amounts Borrower owes to Lender under this Note, Borrower is responsible for paying the balance. Borrower's initialsys Co - Borrower's initials aAX 21st Mortgage Corporation NMLS # 2280 · 620 Market Street, Sulte 100, Knoxville, TN 37902 1 - 800 - 955 - 0021 · www. 21stmortgage. com • Karen Mulryan NMLS # 1087868 AL Version 2 / 5 / 2018 Page 4 of 8 Case 17 - 04785 - TOM13 Doc 32 Filed 02 / 12 / 18 Entered 02 / 12 / 18 16: 09: 29 Desc Main Document Page 8 of 13 ESCROW ITEMS: To the extent permitted by law, Lender may, at Lender's option, require Borrower to make payments in addition to those set forth in Borrower's Payment Schedule ("Escrow Payments") which Lender will collect and hold for (1) the payment of property insurance premiums required under this Note, (2) the payment of taxes and assessments, and (3) other items which might attain priority over Lender's security interest (each, an " Escrow Item") . Lender will use Borrower's Escrow Payments to pay Escrow Items as they come due, THE BORROWER'S PAYMENT SCHEDULE IN THIS NOTE DOES NOT INCLUDE ANY AMOUNT TO BE PAID UNDER ANY SUCH ESCROW ACCOUNT. VINTS SERVICING CHARGES: Borrower agrees to pay all reasonable charges for Lender's performance of additional services requested by Borrower in connection with the servicing of this Note, to the extent permitted by applicable law. ADVANCES TO PROTECT THE COLLATERAL: If Borrower fails to pay for required Insurance, if Borrower falls to pay park or lot rent (and any other related charges), if Borrower fails to satisfy taxes, assessments, or other liens or encumbrances against the Manufactured Home, If Borrower fails to keep the Manufactured Home in good repair or if Borrower fails to make any other payments required by this Note or applicable law, Lender may (but is not required to) make such repairs or payments as Lender chooses. Lender will add any and all such payments and any amounts Lender pays to protect or enforce Lender's security interest to the amount Borrower owes Lender under this Note, and all such amounts will be secured by the Collateral. At Lender's sole option, Lender may (1) demand that Borrower repay these amounts immediately, or (2) add these amounts to Borrower's regularly scheduled payments, or (3) add these amounts as additional installments due, or (4) add these amounts to the final installment due on this Note. Unless prohibited by law, Borrower agrees to pay interest at the Note Rate on any amounts that Borrower does not repay Immediately. DELINQUENCY AND DEFAULT: Time is of the essence. If a payment is more than 15 days late, Borrower will be charged 5 % of the amount of such payment, not to exceed $ 100. 00. If any check, negotiable instrument of withdrawal, electronic payment draft or any other instrument is dishonored by Borrower's financial institution, Borrower will pay the greater of $ 20. 00 or the amount charged by the depository institution for such dishonor, in addition to making payment on the item. Borrower will be in default under this Note If: (1) Borrower fails to make any payment when due; (2) Borrower otherwise fails to perform any of Borrower's obligations under this Note or under any mortgage or deed of trust which secures this Note; (3) Borrower dies or becomes legally unable to manage Borrower's affairs; (4) any statement of fact, representation or warranty Borrower makes to Lender in Borrower's application for credit, any other document submitted to the Lender or signed by Borrower in connection with this Note, or in any Note document is false, misleading, inaccurate, or incomplete; or (5) Borrower files a petition in bankruptcy, or a party files a petition in bankruptcy against Borrower. In the event of Borrower's default, Lender will give Borrower notice of the default and right to cure the default ("Notice of Default") . Borrower is not entitled to a Notice of Default if Borrower abandons or voluntarily surrenders the Manufactured Home, or if other extreme circumstances exist. Borrower is not, under any circumstances, entitled to a Notice of Default more than twice in any one year period. If Borrower does not cure the default within 30 days after the postmarked date of the Notice of Default, or if a Notice of Default is not required to be sent, Lender may (1) accelerate the maturity of the debt and require Borrower to pay Lender the entire remaining balance and all other amounts due under the Note, (2) require Borrower to make the Manufactured Home available to Lender, (3) take legal action against Borrower, (4) repossess the Manufactured Home, (5) enforce such rights and remedies available to Lender under the Uniform Commercial Code and other applicable law, and (6) foreclose on the real property, if applicable. Lender, at its sole option, may elect to sever and remove the Manufactured Home from any real property where it is located, regardless of whether the real property secures this Note. In the event of default, Borrower also agrees to pay Lender's expenses for (a) reasonable attorney's fees permitted under law after referral to an attorney who is not a salaried employee of the Lender; (b) court costs and disbursements; and (c) costs of repossessing the Manufactured Home including the costs of storage, reconditioning, and resale. Before Lender sells the Manufactured Home, Borrower can get the Manufactured Home back if Borrower either (1) pays off the Note by paying Lender the entire remaining balance and all other amounts due under the Note (redeem), or (2) cures the default by paying Lender the amounts which are past due, including Late Charges (reinstate) . Regardless of whether Borrower redeems or reinstates, and before Borrower can get the Manufactured Home back, Borrower must also (1) pay Lender the cost of taking, storing and redelivering the Manufactured Home and other expenses Lender incurs; (2) pay Lender all other charges and other expenses provided for under this Note; (3) pay any amounts advanced by Lender to protect the Collateral, without regard to any agreement to repay such amounts advanced on a periodic basis, including but not limited to unpaid Insurance premiums, park or lot rent, taxes, assessments or similar items; and (4) cure any other defaults. Borrower's rights to redeem and / or reinstate end upon sale of the Manufactured Home unless otherwise required by law. AI ! rights and remedies under this Note and any mortgage or deed of trust executed herewith are cumulative, but Borrower's right to a written notice of default and 30 days to cure, as set forth in this Note, shall not be affected by any inconsistent provision of any mortgage or deed of trust. Any personal property of Borrower's located in or attached to the Manufactured Home and not subject to Lender's security interest may be held by Lender without liability if the Lender repossesses the Manufactured Home. Borrower will be deemed to have waived any claim to such personal property unless written demand by certified mail is made upon Lender within twenty - five (25) days after repossession. If Borrower fails to give Lender such written demand, Lender may dispose of such personal property. THIS SPACE LEFT INTENTIONALLY BLANK E Borower's Initials Co - Bomowers initials _ 21st Mortgage Corporation NMLS # 2280 · 620 Market Street, Suite 100, Knoxville, TN 37902 1 - 800 - 955 - 0021 • www. 21stmortgage. com • Karen Mulryan NMLS # 1087868 AL Version 2 / 5 / 2016 Page 5 ol 8 Case 17 - 04785 - TOM13 Doc 32 Filed 02 / 12 / 18 Entered 02 / 12 / 18 16: 09: 29 Desc Main Document Page 9 of 13 COn AUS INFORMATION SHARING: Lender may investigate Borrower's credit history and credit capacity in connection with establishing, modifying, extending, and / or enforcing Borrower's account. Lender may report Information about Borrower's account to credit bureaus. Late payments, missed payments, or other defaults on Borrower's account may be reflected in Borrower's credit report. Lender may also verify Borrower's employment, income, assets, and debts; and anyone receiving a copy of this Note is hereby authorized to release such, Information to Lender. Barrower authorizes Lender to release to third parties any information necessary to monitor the status of insurance on Borrower's Manufactured Home, and to obtain the insurance described in this Note. If Borrower's Manufactured Home Is on rented property or property that is not owned by Borrower, Borrower authorizes Lender and Borrower's landlord (or the property owner) to exchange information as to Borrowers obligations to Lender under this Note and the status of such obligations, information relating to Lender's security interest in Borrower's Manufactured Home, and information regarding the lease or arrangement between Borrower and landlord (or the property owner), as well as the obligations and status of such obligations to landlord (or the property owner) . Whether or not the Borrower rents the Manufactured Home to a party in accordance with the terms of this Note, Borrower authorizes Lender and Borrower's renter to exchange information as to Lender's security interest in Borrower's Manufactured Home and the rental agreement or arrangement, as well as to the obligations, and the status of such obligations of Borrower to Lender under this Note. This provision also applies to any Co - Signer who executes this Note. OTHER TERMS AND CONDITIONS: Borrower will not move the Manufactured Home without Lender's prior written consent. Borrower will not sell the Manufactured Home without Lender's prior written consent. Borrower agrees that the Manufactured Home is, and shall remain, during the term of this Note, personal property. Unless Lender gives prior written consent, Borrower shall not allow the Manufactured Home to become a part of real estate or to lose its status as personal property under applicable law. Borrower will not encumber or abandon the Manufactured Home, nor allow any lot lien, landlord lien, or similar lien, which may by law be superior to Lender's security interest, to encumber the Manufactured Home. Borrower will not use the Manufactured Home for illegal activity. Borrower will not use the Manufactured Home for business or hire, or rent it to another party, without obtaining Lender's prior written consent. Borrower will pay promptly all taxes, assessments, and any liens and encumbrances on the Manufactured Home. Borrower will notify Lender promptly of any loss or damage to the Manufactured Home, as well as any condemnation, confiscation or theft of the Manufactured Home. Upon Lender's request, Borrower will promptly provide Lender with proof satisfactory to Lender that: (1) Borrower has the insurance required under this Note: (2) Borrower has paid all taxes assessed against the Manufactured Home; (3) Borrower has pald all park or tot rent (and any other related charges) due; (4) Lender holds the only lien against the Manufactured Home; (5) the Manufactured Home is in good condition and repair; and (6) Borrower has complied with all of the promises Borrower made in this Note. Lender may inspect the Manufactured Home at any time. If Borrower is married, and residing in a community property state, both Borrower's community property and separate property are liable for all payments under this Note. Borrower waives all marital rights, homestead exemption and other exemptions relating to the Collateral. Borrower will cooperate with Lender regarding any requests after closing to correct any errors with respect to this Note or the transaction and agrees to provide any and all additional documentation deemed necessary by Lender to complete this transaction. Lender may rely on a telecopy, photocopy, or electronically imaged copy of this Note as if it were an original, including use in legal proceedings or arbitrations. Borrower acknowledges that any broker or other third party used to facilitate this transaction may receive compensation from Lender for its services. ASSUMPTION; Someone buying the Manufactured Home may assume the remainder of Borrower's obligations under this Note on the original terms only if such person is approved by Lender. ASSIGNMENT: Lender may assign this Note to any person or entity. All rights granted to Lender under this Note shall apply to any assignee of this Note. WAIVER AND MODIFICATION: Lender's waiver of any default shall not constitute a waiver of any other default. The procurement of required property insurance, or the payment of taxes, or other llens, or other charges, by Lender shall not be a waiver of Lender's right to accelerate the maturity of this Note and declare default herein. To the extent permitted by law, Borrower agrees to give up Borrower's rights to require Lender to do certain things. Borrower does not give up any rights that are provided in this Note. Unless the law or this Note provides otherwise, Lender is not required to: (1) demand payment of amounts due; (2) give notice that amounts due have not been paid, or have not been paid in the appropriate amount, time, or manner; or, (3) give notice that Lender intends to make, or is making, this Note immediately due. WARRANTIES: LENDER MAKES NO WARRANTIES ON THE MANUFACTURED HOME, AND EXPRESSLY EXCLUDES ANY EXPRESS OR IMPLIED WARRANTY, INCLUDING ANY IMPLIED WARRANTY OF MERCHANTABILITY OR WARRANTY OF FITNESS FOR A PARTICULAR PURPOSE, UNLESS GIVEN TO BORROWER BY LENDER IN WRITING AT THE TIME OF SALE. BORROWER AGREES THAT THE YEAR OF THE MANUFACTURED HOME IS FOR IDENTIFICATION PURPOSES ONLY AND MAY NOT BE THE BASIS FOR A WARRANTY OR OTHER CLAIM AGAINST LENDER. THE ABOVE DISCLAIMERS DO NOT AFFECT ANY WARRANTIES COVERING THE MANUFACTURED HOME THAT MAY BE PROVIDED BY THE MANUFACTURER, OTHER THIRD PARTIES, OR THAT ARE REQUIRED BY LAW, Borrower's Initials MVS Co - BoTower's initials _ MAY 21st Mortgage Corporation NMLS # 2280 · 620 Market Street, Suite 100, Knoxville, TN 37902 1 - 800 - 955 - 0021 · www. 21stmortgage. com · Karen Mulryan NMLS # 1087868 AL Version 2 / 6 / 2016 Page 6 of 8 Case 17 - 04785 - TOM13 Doc 32 Filed 02 / 12 / 18 Entered 02 / 12 / 18 16: 09: 29 Desc Main Document Page 10 of 13 numerumus varpukar. Aihy VALIDITY AND EFFECTIVENESS: Wherever possible each provision of this Note shall be interpreted in such a manner as to be effective and valid under applicable law. If any provision of this Note is prohibited by or Invalid under applicable law, such provision shall be ineffective to the extent of such prohibition or invalidity, however, the remainder of such provision or the remaining provisions of this Note shall not be invalidated. This Note shall be governed both as to issues of formation and performance by the laws of the State of Alabama and applicable federal law. This Note shall have no effect until and unless signed by Borrower and Lender. Lender does not intend to charge or collect any interest, charge, or fee greater than the law allows. If Lender charges or collects any amount greater than what the law allows, Lender will apply the excess to the Unpaid Balance and any other amounts due under the Note and shall refund any excess. Lender will treat any amount applied to the Unpaid Balance as a partial Prepayment. ENTIRE AGREEMENT: This Note, any separate escrow agreement, and any mortgage or deed of trust, together, the " Entire Agreement Documents, " shall constitute the entire agreement between Borrower and Lender. To the extent permitted by applicable law, Borrower agrees that no representations, oral or written, have been made to Borrower to induce Borrower to enter into the Entire Agreement Documents, except as set forth therein. GUARANTY: Any Co - Signer signing the guaranty of this Note agrees that all amounts owed under this Note will be paid when due. Co - Signer's obligation continues even if Borrower is released or if Lender waives or delays enforcement of any rights under this Note. Lender need not give Co - Signer notice of any such waiver, delay or release. See Notice to Co - Signer before signing this guaranty. THIS SPACE LEFT INTENTIONALLY BLANK Boromarts bilang Als colorante la sua AS mezo ca manter som side 1909 en la Marne Borrower's InitialstLES Co - Borrower's Initials NAV 21st Mortgage Corporation NMLS # 2280 · 620 Market Street, Suite 100, Knoxville, TN 37902 1 - 800 - 955 - 0021 • WWW. 21stmortgage. com • Karen Muiryan NMLS # 1087868 AL Version 2 / 5 / 2016 Page 7 of 8 Case 17 - 04785 - TOM13 Doc 32 Filed 02 / 12 / 18 Entered 02 / 12 / 18 16: 09: 29 Desc Main Document Page 11 of 13 III pm NOTICE ANY HOLDER OF THIS CONSUMER CREDIT CONTRACT IS SUBJECT TO ALL CLAIMS AND DEFENSES WHICH THE DEBTOR (BORROWER) COULD ASSERT AGAINST THE SELLER OF GOODS OR SERVICES OBTAINED PURSUANT HERETO OR WITH THE PROCEEDS HEREOF. RECOVERY HEREUNDER BY THE DEBTOR (BORROWER) SHALL NOT EXCEED AMOUNTS PAID BY THE DEBTOR (BORROWER) HEREUNDER. TO CONTACT 21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION ABOUT THIS ACCOUNT CALL (865) 523 - 2120 OR (800) 955 - 0021, THIS CONTRACT IS SUBJECT TO ALABAMA AND FEDERAL LAW WHICH IS ENFORCED BY THE STATE BANKING DEPARTMENT, 401 ADAMS AVENUE, MONTGOMERY ALABAMA 36130; OR TELEPHONE (334) 242 - 3452. CONTACT THE SUPERINTENDENT OF BANKS RELATIVE TO ANY INQUIRIES OR COMPLAINTS. NOTICE TO THE CONSUMER (1) DO NOT SIGN THIS NOTE BEFORE YOU READ IT OR IF IT CONTAINS ANY BLANK SPACES; (2) YOU ARE ENTITLED TO AN EXACT COPY OF THE NOTE YOU SIGN. KEEP IT TO PROTECT YOUR LEGAL RIGHTS; (3) BY SIGNING THIS NOTE, YOU ACKNOWLEDGE RECEIPT OF A COMPLETED COPY OF THIS NOTE; AND, (4) AT ANY TIME, YOU HAVE THE RIGHT TO PAY IN ADVANCE THE UNPAID TIME ADVANC BALANCE DUE UNDER THIS NOTE WITHOUT PENALTY. DIC SIGNATURE OF BORROWER (S): " Borrower " refers to all persons who sign this Note as " Borrower " and " Co - Borrower ", jointly and severally. Borrower's signature (s) below indicates the following: 1) Borrower has fully and completely read all of this Note; 2) Borrower has consulted independent legal counsel to clarify any matters, If Borrower deemed such was necessary; 3) Borrower has no questions regarding any matters contained in this Note and understands all terms, conditions and obligations set forth in this Note; and, 4) Borrower agrees to fully satisfy and abide by all terms, conditions and obligations set forth In this Note. CAUTION - IT IS IMPORTANT THAT YOU THOROUGHLY READ THE CONTRACT BEFORE YOU SIGN IT. T (' L X Date Anna M Adams Shaw ICÍul / Wendi R Shaw Date) NOT VALID UNLESS ACCEPTED BY LENDER: 21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION Corey O ' Neal 12 1 - 31 - 16 By: . Printed Name Title Date Initialing below is not necessary. Borrower (s) should sign above. Borrower's initials WUS Co - Borrower's Initials QVAY 21st Mortgage Corporation NMLS # 2280 - 620 Market Street, Suite 100, Knoxville, TN 37902 1 - 800 - 955 - 0021 · www. 21stmortgage. com. Karen Mulryan NMLS # 1087868 AL Version 2 / 5 / 2016 Page 8 of 8 Case 17 - 04785 - TOM13 Doc 32 Filed 02 / 12 / 18 Entered 02 / 12 / 18 16: 09: 29 Desc Main Document Page 12 of 13 SENEGYENAREKSANCTI DIE NORMALES * * * * * * SELAT TAISTEAL Baki655 - * * 3BIINIMETATH, FE2 - E4 ESTATUTINIS kynntarerrtystyrir yn wertraiteitiefHt. Tyvärvaat. Aastatyn Neotesaurisirss > > resta wapkrieges ' SEAU CERTIFICATE OF TITLE FOR A VEHICLE TTLE NO. VEHICLE IDENTIFICATION NUMBER TFANS. CODE DATE ISSUED 08 / 02 / 2016 BODY TYPE PAEV AL TTLE NO. ΜΗ ODOMETER. . . * s. EXEMPT: 52274318 SA4071041 AL 01 YR, KIOPEL MAKE. . WODEL (VOOEL 2018 TRU HM 42TRU14783AH CYL NEW USED DEMO PURCHASE DATENO. LIENS COLOR 00 XX 07115 / 2016 1 BGE ' NAME (S) AND MAILING ADDRESS OF OWNER (S) SHAW WENDI R AND ADAMS SHAW ANNA M 100 MADISON DR TRUSSVILLE AL 35173 21ST MORTGAGE CORP PO BOX 477 RESIDENT ADDRESS IF DIFFERENT. KNOXVILLE TN 37901 * * * KAKTO HOLDTONLIGH Kalas. Lassa. Lisaks siiski YAXSUSKS NGC / DC / DCAS RHOLD TO LIGHT TO VIEW WATERMARK LEGEND (S) ' . .:: . . . . VIETIWA TER. ' E ', RELEASE OF UEN * 2. The holder at Lian - on the vehicle described: in this Certicate does hereby state that the tien described ' in sald Caricate " . TRío ' 6. . rlಶಿಣಭ ತರ ಭಕೀಳಘfgs, First Lienholder i ' i. Nii, 07 / 15 / 2016 Signature of Authorized Agent, IST WENHOLDER'S NAME, ADDRESS AND UEN DATE 21ST MORTGAGE CORP PO BOX 477 KNOXVILLE, TN 37901 2ND LIENHOLDERS NAME ADDRESS AND UEN DATE. . . G. A. ': ' > * ?, * SUCOnd Lienholdor 21 Signature of ' Authorizod Ager "::: ' . ' . Dats: * * * · ·, CONTROL NUMBER This carificate serves as an official document of the Department of Revenue and prima facie evidence that an applikation for certificate: of Use thas been made to the vehicle descrittod homln, pursuant to the provisions of Ung Notr Vehicle laws od bis state, and the applicant named on the lace hatol has been dufy recorded as ths tawid ost of the vehicle 59 described. Further, tha se Veilcle is subject to the security interest by MGMS) show hareon, il any. But, sald described vehicle may be sutisect to a mechank's Den ora ken given by statute to the tunited States, this State or any polical subdivision dihia State or other BBCumbrancas TML required to be filled with this Dopörtment A SAFE PL ANY ALTERAT PLEASE DETACH 0419 - 01 - 00 - 0003596 - 0005 - of - 0005 - 0006074 Case 17 - 04785 - TOM13 Doc 32 Filed 02 / 12 / 18 Entered 02 / 12 / 18 16: 09: 29 Desc Main Document Page 13 of 13

Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor 21st Mortgage Corporation (RE: related document(s)[32] Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay,).

IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION Wendi Adams Shaw) SS# XXX-XX-4581) Debtor(s).)) Bankruptcy Case No.: 17-04785-TOM13 21st Mortgage Corporation) Movant.) Chapter 13) FACT SUMMARY SHEET FOR MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM AUTOMATIC STAY OR FOR ADEQUATE PROTECTION IN CHAPTER 7 AND 13 CASES Type of Loan/Credit Transaction: Installment Contract Date of Loan/Credit Transaction 07/15/2016 Type of Collateral: 2016 Tru Manufactured Home Monthly Payment: $368.26 Amount Financed: $29,535.86 APR or Interest Rate: 9.75% Term of Loan: 180 months or years Payoff Amount: $33,070.49 as of 03/02/2018 (Date) Value of Collateral and Basis: $25,000.00 (Value) as of 11/07/2017 (Date) and Debtor's Schedule D (Basis) Address of real property: N/A Delinquent Pre-Petition Payments: What Month(s)? 08/15/2016 – 10/15/20017 Amount: $7,390.14 Claim Filed? X Yes No Date Claim Filed: 11/20/2017 Claim Number 4 Number of Months of Pre-Petition Payment Default Put into Debtor's Chapter 13 Plan: 15 Delinquent Post-Petition Payments: What Month(s)? 12/15/2018 – 01/15/2018 Amount of mortgage payment: $368.26 Late Charges: Court Costs/Attorney's fees? $681.00 Total Amount Due $1,417.52 Claim Filed? Yes X No Date Claim Filed: Claim Number Number of Post-Petition Payments Received (Not How Applied): Number of Post-Petition Payment(s) Held by Creditor, but Not Applied to Debt: Number of Post-Petition Payment(s) Returned by Creditor to Debtor: If Lease, Lease Expiration Date: N/A If Terminated, Lease Termination Date: Insurer of Collateral: unknown Term of Insurance: (Expiration Date) Prior Stay Order(s) Involving Movant Including Current Case: Yes or X No If yes, give case number(s) and date(s) of order(s): Case No.: Date: Case No.: Date: Case No.: Date: Debtor's Statement of Intention: N/A Date: February 12, 2018 Submitted By: /s/ Kristofor D. Sodergren (Signature) Case 17-04785-TOM13 Doc 33 Filed 02/12/18 Entered 02/12/18 16:12:20 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE This is to certify that I have this day served the foregoing upon the following: Bradford W. Caraway (kmitchell@ch13bham.com via CM/ECF Noticing Services) Chapter 13 Trustee P.O. Drawer 10848 Birmingham, AL 35202 Brent William Davis (brent@brentwdavis.com via CM/ECF Noticing Services) Attorney for Debtor 2700 Rogers Drive, Suite 106 Homewood, AL 35209 This the 12th day of February, 2018. /s/ Kristofor D. Sodergren Kristofor D. Sodergren (SODEK-0591) Of Counsel for 21st Mortgage Corporation OF COUNSEL ROSEN HARWOOD, PA 2200 Jack Warner Parkway, Suite 200 (35401) Post Office Box 2727 Tuscaloosa, AL 35403-2727 Telephone: (205) 344-5000 ksodergren@rosenharwood.com Case 17-04785-TOM13 Doc 33 Filed 02/12/18 Entered 02/12/18 16:12:20 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 248 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/07/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Wendi Adams Shaw
2
11/07/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Wendi Adams Shaw.
3
11/07/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Wendi Adams Shaw
5
11/07/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Wendi Adams Shaw.
6
11/07/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Wendi Adams Shaw.
7
11/07/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Wendi Adams Shaw.
8
11/07/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/13/2017 at 10:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/18/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/13/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 05/07/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 02/12/2018.
9
11/08/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10
11/08/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Wendi Adams Shaw).
11
11/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 11/09/2017.
12
11/10/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Wendi Adams Shaw). Notice Date 11/10/2017.
13
11/10/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 11/10/2017.
14
11/15/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Farmers Furniture.
15
11/15/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
16
11/27/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
17
11/28/2017
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Wendi Adams Shaw.
18
11/28/2017
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Statement of Financial Affairs for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Wendi Adams Shaw.
19
11/30/2017
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Wendi Adams Shaw.
20
12/01/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
21
12/14/2017
*ENTERED IN ERROR - incorrect date* Meeting of Creditors Held 12/20/2017. (Ch13troffice, bc) Modified on 12/14/2017
22
12/14/2017
CORRECTIVE ENTRY incorrect date Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway (RE: related document(s) 21 Meeting of Creditors Held). (Ch13troffice, bc)
23
12/14/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 12/13/2017. (Ch13troffice, bc)
24
12/18/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
25
12/18/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 24 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 1/18/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
26
12/20/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 25 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/20/2017.
27
01/19/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/18/2018 11:33:18 AM ]. File Size [ 235 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:39 ]. (RE: Doc #24; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). (adiuser).
28
01/19/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
01/22/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 155.00 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04785-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (155.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21630625. Fee Amount 155.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
02/01/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 2/1/2018 (RE: related document(s) 19 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Wendi Adams Shaw, 24 Trustees Objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied).
30
02/02/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
31
02/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 29 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 02/03/2018.
02/08/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04785-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21700433. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
02/12/2018
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, in addition to Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay, Filed by Creditor 21st Mortgage Corporation
33
02/12/2018
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor 21st Mortgage Corporation (RE: related document(s)[32] Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay,).
34
02/14/2018
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Kristofor Sodergren, Attorney for 21st Mortgage Corporation (RE: related document(s)[32] Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor 21st Mortgage Corporation, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay). Hearing scheduled 3/8/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
07/21/2018
Order (Non-Image) (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
07/24/2018
Courtroom Deputy Notes (Public)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.