Wenona Magdalene Diaz
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00226 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/19/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
07/19/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
07/19/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
07/19/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
4
07/19/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
07/20/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
07/19/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
6
07/20/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
7
07/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
8
07/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
07/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
11
07/23/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12
08/02/2018
Extend Time
13
08/02/2018
Extend Time
14
08/15/2018
Schedules A-J
15
08/15/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
16
08/15/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
17
08/15/2018
Amended Voluntary Petition
18
08/15/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
19
08/15/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
08/15/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
08/16/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
21
08/16/2018
Affidavit of Service
22
08/16/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
23
08/16/2018
Certificate of Service
24
08/16/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
08/16/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
08/21/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
26
08/21/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
08/21/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
08/31/2018
Compensation
28
09/04/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
29
09/04/2018
Certificate of Service
32
09/12/2018
Proceeding Memo
33
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
09/20/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
09/26/2018
Certificate of No Objection
35
09/28/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
36
09/28/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
10/14/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.