Werner v. Holland America Line, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cv-00018 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/04/2018
Notice of Removal
2
12/04/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
12/04/2018
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
4
12/06/2018
Notice of Service List
5
12/06/2018
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
6
12/10/2018
Answer to Complaint
7
12/26/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
8
01/17/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
9
03/04/2019
Change Venue
10
03/04/2019
Declaration
11
03/14/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
12
03/14/2019
Declaration
13
03/14/2019
Declaration
14
03/21/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
03/26/2019
Docket Annotation re Wrong Event Selected (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
03/26/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
16
04/01/2019
Witness List

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.