West v. Alaska Airlines, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00102 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
6
05/21/2018
Notice of Appearance
7
05/21/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
8
05/21/2018
Dismiss
9
05/21/2018
Affidavit
10
05/21/2018
Affidavit
11
05/30/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
12
05/31/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
06/01/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
06/21/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
15
06/21/2018
Affidavit
16
07/05/2018
Stipulation
07/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
07/12/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
19
07/12/2018
Hearing
21
07/16/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
22
07/17/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
23
07/30/2018
Scheduling Order
24
08/09/2018
Stipulation
25
08/10/2018
Order on Stipulation
08/24/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
08/24/2018
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
28
08/30/2018
Transcript
29
12/06/2018
ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS: Alaska Airlines' Motion to Dismiss at Docket 8 is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. Within 14 days of the date of this order, Ms. West may file an amended complaint; answer due w/in 14 days. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/06/2018.
30
12/20/2018
Notice (Other)
31
12/28/2018
Stipulation
12/31/2018
Order on Stipulation (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
01/14/2019
Answer to Complaint
34
04/19/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.