West v. Commissioner of Social Security
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00172 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 296 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/24/2018
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Michelle Nicole West.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
2
07/24/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
07/24/2018
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michelle Nicole West.
4
07/24/2018
Unissued summons re Defendant Commissioner of Social Security
1
United States Attorney General
2
United States Attorney
2 Attachments
5
07/25/2018
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney Edward A. Wicklund. (Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2554465.) by Michelle Nicole West.
1
Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
6
07/31/2018
JUDGE HOLLAND TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Edward A. Wicklund, at docket 5, is GRANTED.
07/31/2018
Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
07/31/2018
07/31/2018
Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket [8], when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Order on Motion to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Docket Annotation re Opening Brief (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
08/23/2018
Order
10
08/30/2018
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
11
08/30/2018
Notice of Appearance
12
09/15/2018
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Howard on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security
13
10/29/2018
ANSWER to [1] Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.
14
10/29/2018
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record
1
Certification Page
2
Court Transcript Index
3
Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearin
4
Payment Documents and Decisions
5
Jurisdictional Documents and Notices
6
Non Disability Related Development
7
Disability Related Development
8
Medical Records Part 1
9
Medical Records Part 2
10
Medical Records Part 3
11
Medical Records Part 4
12
Medical Records Part 5
12 Attachments
15
11/28/2018
MOTION to Remand in a Social Security Appeal by Michelle Nicole West.
16
12/19/2018
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [15] MOTION to Remand in a Social Security Appeal (Unopposed) by Commissioner of Social Security.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
17
12/19/2018
DECLARATION of Michael Howard re [16] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [15] MOTION to Remand in a Social Security Appeal (Unopposed) by Commissioner of Social Security.
19
01/14/2019
MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration STIPULATED by Commissioner of Social Security.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
22
04/15/2019
First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 by Michelle Nicole West.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
23
04/15/2019
DECLARATION of Edward A. Wicklund, Esq. re [22] First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 by Michelle Nicole West.
1
Exhibit A All Professional Time
2
Exhibit B Attorney Time
3
Exhibit C Paralegal Time
4
Exhibit D Expenses
5
Exhibit E Executed Fee Agreement
6
Exhibit F Affirmation and Waiver of Direct Payment of EAJA Fees
7
Memorandum in Support
8
Certificate of Service
8 Attachments
24
04/24/2019
RESPONSE to Motion (Non-Opposition) re [22] First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412 filed by Commissioner of Social Security.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.