Whitney Simone Wells
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04137 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 208 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/26/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Whitney Simone Wells
2
09/26/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Whitney Simone Wells.
4
09/26/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Whitney Simone Wells.
5
09/26/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Whitney Simone Wells.
09/26/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(17-04137-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21206689. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
09/26/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Whitney Simone Wells.
7
09/26/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/01/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 11/30/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 01/30/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 03/26/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 01/02/2018.
8
09/27/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
9
09/27/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Whitney Simone Wells.
10
09/28/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
11
09/28/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 09/28/2017.
12
09/29/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Whitney Simone Wells). Notice Date 09/29/2017.
13
09/29/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 09/29/2017.
14
10/31/2017
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
15
11/02/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 11/1/2017. (Ch13troffice, jc)
16
11/06/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
17
11/07/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 11/30/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
18
11/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 17 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/09/2017.
19
11/13/2017
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Whitney Simone Wells.
20
11/13/2017
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 3 of Republic Finance, LLC in the amount of $2,855.28 Filed by Debtor Whitney Simone Wells.
21
11/13/2017
Affidavit Filed by Debtor Whitney Simone Wells (RE: related document(s) 20 Objection to Claim).
22
11/13/2017
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 6 of First Heritage Credit in the amount of $2,581.32 Filed by Debtor Whitney Simone Wells.
23
11/13/2017
Affidavit Filed by Debtor Whitney Simone Wells (RE: related document(s) 22 Objection to Claim).
24
11/14/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 20 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Whitney Simone Wells, 22 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Whitney Simone Wells). Hearing scheduled 12/21/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
25
11/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 24 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/16/2017.
26
11/30/2017
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/30/2017 11:25:07 AM ]. File Size [ 290 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:48 ]. (RE: Doc #16; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). (adiuser).
27
12/04/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 12/4/2017 (RE: related document(s) 7 Confirmation Hearing, 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 1/11/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
28
12/06/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 27 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 12/06/2017.
29
12/21/2017
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/21/2017 9:48:37 AM ]. File Size [ 274 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:46 ]. (RE: Doc #20; Debtor's Objection to Claim # 3 of Republic Finance, LLC in the amount of $2,855.28). (adiuser).
30
12/21/2017
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 3,6 - Objections are Sustained and the balance of claim number 3 and 6 are Disallowed. Signed on 12/21/2017 (RE: related document(s) 20 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Whitney Simone Wells, 22 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Whitney Simone Wells). Further, in the event a deficiency balance claim is not filed timely and a discharge order is entered in this case, then the claimant's right to payment on any deficiency balance is hereby waived. (pbg) Modified to add space between words on 12/21/2017
31
12/23/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 30 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 12/23/2017.
32
01/12/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
33
01/25/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 1/25/2018 (RE: related document(s)[16] Trustees Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are withdrawn, [19] Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Whitney Simone Wells).
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.