Wichman v. National Transportation Safety Board et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00257 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/26/2018
Complaint
2
10/26/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
10/26/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/26/2018
Unissued Summons
4
11/15/2018
Order
5
11/16/2018
Certificate of Service
6
01/09/2019
Notice (Other)
7
01/18/2019
Order
8
01/29/2019
Affidavit of Service
9
02/25/2019
Answer to Complaint
10
02/27/2019
Initial Case Status Report Order
11
03/22/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
12
03/25/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
13
03/31/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
14
04/02/2019
Scheduling Order
15
04/08/2019
Stipulation
16
04/09/2019
Order Dismissing Case

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.