Wilbur Maragana Sangster
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

1:2015-bk-00285 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
83
08/03/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
10/31/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
84
10/31/2018
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
10/31/2018
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
11/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims
86
12/06/2018
Notice of Change of Address for Creditor
12/07/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.