Wild West Guns, LLC v. Superior Ammunition, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00043 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
25
10/10/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
26
10/12/2018
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
27
10/12/2018
Affidavit
28
10/12/2018
Errata
29
10/19/2018
Stipulation
30
10/23/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
10/25/2018
Order on Stipulation (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
11/05/2018
Stipulation
11/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
11/21/2018
Set Aside
36
11/21/2018
Memorandum
12/03/2018
Order on Motion to Set Aside (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
12/14/2018
Stipulation
39
12/17/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
40
12/17/2018
Affidavit
41
12/19/2018
Order
42
12/26/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
01/02/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
01/11/2019
Stipulation
45
01/11/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
01/16/2019
Order on Stipulation (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
01/18/2019
Witness List
48
01/23/2019
Stipulation
01/27/2019
Order on Stipulation (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
02/15/2019
Stipulation
51
02/21/2019
Order
52
02/23/2019
*WITHDRAWN* ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendant Barnett is dismissed from this case Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 2/23/19. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF) Modified on 2/25/2019 to indicate order withdrawn per order at dkt 53
02/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
02/26/2019
Summary Judgment
55
02/26/2019
Memorandum
56
03/05/2019
Witness List
57
03/05/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
58
03/06/2019
Witness List
03/10/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
03/10/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
61
03/11/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
03/12/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
03/18/2019
Stipulation
64
03/20/2019
Notice of Settlement
65
03/22/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
03/24/2019
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/24/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/24/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/24/2019
Status Report Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/24/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
69
04/05/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
04/09/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
04/18/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
72
04/19/2019
Status Report
04/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/22/2019
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/22/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/22/2019
Status Report Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
05/03/2019
Stipulation of Dismissal
76
05/06/2019
Order
05/21/2019
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.