Willa M Moore
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80382 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
50
09/14/2018
Limit Notice
64
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
67
01/07/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
70
01/21/2019
Modify Plan
80
02/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.