Willett v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:2012-cv-00296 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 609 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/04/2012
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Charlie Mae Willett.
2
04/03/2012
COMPLAINT against Patricia Henley, Clifford Robinson, The Veterans Administration of the United States of America (Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 4602022264.), filed by Charlie Mae Willett.
1
fee receipt
1 Attachment
3
04/03/2012
Summons Issued as to Patricia Henley, Clifford Robinson, The Veterans Administration of the United States of America and returned to counsel for personal service on local defendants only.
4
04/06/2012
Summons Issued as to Secretary US Dept of Veterans Affairs, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and mailed CMRRR w/copy of complaint.
5
04/11/2012
Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint signed by Tori Jones for US Attorney served on 4/10/2012, answer due 6/9/2012 from The Veterans Administration of the United States of America.
6
04/13/2012
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlie Mae Willett. Patricia Henley served by process server on 4/4/2012, answer due 4/25/2012.
7
04/13/2012
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlie Mae Willett. Served on 4/4/2012 by process server on Monsherri Golston (secretary) for Clifford Robinson, answer due 4/25/2012.
8
04/23/2012
Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint signed by Office of The Secretary on 4/17/2012 for Eric Shinseki, Secretary of Dept. of Veterans Affairs.
9
05/04/2012
Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint (undated and unsigned) for US Attorney General.
10
06/11/2012
MOTION to Dismiss by Patricia Henley, Clifford Robinson, The Veterans Administration of the United States of America.
11
06/11/2012
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Patricia Henley, Clifford Robinson, The Veterans Administration of the United States of America.
12
06/11/2012
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Patricia Henley, Clifford Robinson, The Veterans Administration of the United States of America.
13
06/11/2012
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Randolph Neeley on behalf of Patricia Henley, Clifford Robinson, The Veterans Administration of the United States of America
14
06/12/2012
BRIEFING ORDER that upon consideration of defendant's 10 MOTION to Dismiss, it is ORDERED that the motion be submitted without oral argument on July 12, 2012; that the plaintiff file a response, which shall include a brief, on or before July 3, 2012; that the defendant may file a reply brief on or before July 12, 2012. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/12/2012.
15
06/27/2012
NOTICE of Appearance by Lakeesha S Griffin on behalf of Charlie Mae Willett (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2012: # 1 Corrected Certificate of Service).
16
06/29/2012
AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Charlie Mae Willett.
17
06/29/2012
RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Opposition Brief with Exhibits to Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Charlie Mae Willett.
18
07/12/2012
REPLY BRIEF re 11 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Patricia Henley, Clifford Robinson, The Veterans Administration of the United States of America.
1
https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01711901136" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01711901136','47849','56','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Exhibit 1 - Declaration of James R. Talton, FACHE) Modified on 10/31/2012 to clarify text to reflect as filed by defendant United States of America only (qc/djy,)
1 Attachment
19
07/12/2012
MOTION to Dismiss (RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Patricia Henley, Clifford Robinson, The Veterans Administration of the United States of America. Modified on 10/31/2012 to clarify text to reflect as filed by defendant United States of America only (qc/djy,).
20
10/31/2012
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Charlie Mae Willett.
10/31/2012
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 18 Reply Brief and 19 MOTION to Dismiss to clarify text to reflect these documents filed by defendant United States of America only (No PDF document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
10/31/2012
ORDER granting 20 Motion for Lakeesha S. Griffin to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/31/12.
10/31/2012
*** Attorney Lakeesha S Griffin terminated pursuant to 21 order (NO PDF Document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
01/09/2013
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 19 MOTION to Dismiss; GRANTING plaintiff until 1/23/2013 to file an amended complaint that cures the defects addressed in this opinion, as further set out in order; further ORDERING that the 10 MOTION to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/9/13.
1
civil appeals checklist
1 Attachment
23
01/17/2013
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against United States of America, filed by Charlie Mae Willett.
24
01/23/2013
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by The Veterans Administration of the United States of America, United States of America.
25
01/24/2013
ORDER granting 24 MOTION to Extend Time; Dfts shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plf's complaint on or before 3/18/2013. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/24/2013.
26
03/18/2013
NOTICE of Appearance by James Joseph DuBois on behalf of United States of America
27
03/18/2013
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by United States of America.
28
03/18/2013
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismss Plaintff's Second Amended Complaint filed by United States of America. Modified on 3/19/2013 to clarify text as in support of 27 motion (qc/djy,).
03/19/2013
NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re 28 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support to clarify text as in support of 27 motion (NO PDF Document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
03/19/2013
GENERAL BRIEFING ORDER for any motions to remand, motions to dismiss, motions for judgment on the pleadings, and motions for summary judgment setting briefing schedule, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/19/13.
30
04/04/2013
(STRICKEN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES RE: Non-Filing of Civil Discovery) RESPONSE to Discovery Request from James Joseph DuBois by Charlie Mae Willett. Modified on 4/5/2013 (qc/djy,).
31
04/05/2013
NOTICE of Non-Compliance re 30 NOTICE of Discovery which is hereby STRICKEN pursuant to Local Rules re: Non-Filing of Civil Discovery.
32
04/08/2013
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss filed by Charlie Mae Willett. Modified on 4/9/2013 to clarify text to reflect as in opposition to 27 motion (qc/djy,).
33
04/10/2013
First MOTION to Strike 27 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Charlie Mae Willett.
34
04/15/2013
RESPONSE to Motion re 33 First MOTION to Strike 27 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by United States of America.
35
04/15/2013
REPLY BRIEF (Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) filed by United States of America.
36
06/27/2013
ORDER DENYING 27 MOTION to Dismiss; defendant may refile its motion on or before 9/9/2013; further ORDERING that plaintiff is GRANTED LEAVE to conduct limited jurisdictional discovery, as further set out in order; further ORDERING that based on said discovery, plaintiff should file any Response to any Motion to dismiss from defendant on or before 9/30/2013; the defendant's Reply Brief, if any, shall be filed on or before 10/7/2013, as further set out in order; further ORDERING that plaintiff's 33 MOTION to Strike is DENIED, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/27/13.
37
08/19/2013
(STRICKEN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES RE: Non-Filing of Civil Discovery) INTERROGATORIES Propounded to CAVHCS(USA) by Charlie Mae Willett. Modified on 8/20/2013.
38
08/19/2013
(STRICKEN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES RE: Non-Filing of Civil Discovery) REQUEST for Production of Documents by Charlie Mae Willett. Modified on 8/20/2013 (qc/djy,).
39
08/20/2013
NOTICE of Non-Compliance re 37 Interrogatories Propounded and 38 Request for Production of Documents which are hereby STRICKEN pursuant to Local Rules re: Non-Filing of Civil Discovery.
1
local rule 26.3
1 Attachment
40
09/09/2013
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Michael Doyle on behalf of United States of America
41
09/09/2013
MOTION to Dismiss (RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S 23 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) by United States of America. Modified on 9/10/2013 to clarify text creating link to 23 second amended complaint (qc/djy,).
42
09/09/2013
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 41 MOTION to Dismiss (RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by United States of America.
43
09/26/2013
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Charlie Mae Willett.
44
09/27/2013
RESPONSE to Motion re 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by United States of America.
1
Exhibit A - Defendant's Letter dated August 28, 2013
2
Exhibit B - Email Exchange
2 Attachments
45
10/02/2013
ORDER that Plaintiff's 43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Rely is GRANTED. Plaintiff has until on or before 10/30/2013 to file a response, and Defendant has until on or before 11/10/2013 to reply. The General Briefing Order (Doc. 29) otherwise remains in effect. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/2/2013.
46
10/08/2013
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Charlie Mae Willett.
47
10/10/2013
ORDER that the 46 Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED, and that Landis Sexton is permitted to withdraw as attorney of record for Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/10/2013.
10/10/2013
*** Attorney Lowell Landis Sexton terminated pursuant to Court 47 Order. (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
10/29/2013
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to the United States' 41 Renewed Motion to Dimiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Charlie Mae Willett. Modified on 10/30/2013 to create link to Doc. 41.
1
Exhibit Subject-matter Jurisdiction Exhibit
2
Exhibit Subject-matter Jurisdiction Exhibit
2 Attachments
49
11/08/2013
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Reply Brief by United States of America.
50
11/08/2013
ORDER that the Government's 49 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply is GRANTED. The Government has until on or before 11/25/2013 to reply. The 29 General Briefing Order otherwise remains in effect. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/8/2013.
51
11/25/2013
REPLY BRIEF re 41 MOTION to Dismiss (RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by United States of America.
1
EXHIBIT 1.pdf
2
EXHIBIT 2.pdf
3
EXHIBIT 3.pdf
3 Attachments
52
06/03/2014
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the United State's 41 Renewed Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED as further set out in the opinion and order. A separate judgment will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/3/2014.
53
06/03/2014
FINAL JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of the United States of America, and against Plaintiff Charlie Mae Willett. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to FRCP 58. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/3/2014.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
54
06/04/2014
MOTION to Withdraw, MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Charlie Mae Willett.
55
06/05/2014
ORDER that the 54 Motion to Withdraw filed by Julian L. McPhillips, Jr., Esq., is GRANTED conditionally, provided that on or before 6/12/2014, counsel for Plaintiff file a Notice containing Plaintiff Charlie Mae Willett's address for service. It is further ORDERED that upon the filing of the Notice, the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this Order on Ms. Willett at the address provided. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/5/2014.
56
06/06/2014
NOTICE by Charlie Mae Willett
57
06/16/2014
Return receipt card showing service of 55 Order mailed to Charlie Mae Willett signed by Charlie Mae Willett on 6/11/2014.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.