William Claude Abercrombie
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00135 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
13
06/07/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
14
06/27/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
15
07/31/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
16
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
08/21/2018
Entry of Appearance
18
08/21/2018
Objection to Claim of Exemptions (CM46-COAwith)
19
08/21/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
20
08/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
21
08/31/2018
Errata
22
08/31/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
23
09/04/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
24
09/05/2018
Extend Time
27
10/01/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
10/02/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
10/03/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
29
10/23/2018
Hearing
30
10/26/2018
Stipulation
31
10/30/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
32
11/19/2018
Stipulation
33
11/19/2018
Proceeding Memo
34
11/20/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
35
11/21/2018
Deposition
12/12/2018
Notice of Withdrawal of No Distribution Report (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.