William David Willever and Gia Maria Kayl-Willever
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2016-bk-00351 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
1
11/09/2016
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of William David Willever and gia Maria Kayl-willever
97
08/24/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
98
08/24/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
101
09/13/2018
Extend Time
102
09/17/2018
Extend Time
09/17/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
103
10/15/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
10/16/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
104
11/08/2018
Hearing
105
12/13/2018
Proceeding Memo
106
12/13/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
107
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
108
12/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/20/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
109
12/31/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
110
01/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
111
01/24/2019
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
01/25/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.