William Edwin Crick and Carol Josephine Crick
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81543 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
05/24/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/24/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
30
07/24/2018
Approving
45
02/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
02/20/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.