William Francis Kerst and Natasha Marie Kerst
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00436 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/26/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
12/26/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
12/26/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
12/26/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
12/26/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
12/26/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
12/26/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
12/27/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
12/27/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
12/27/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
12/28/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12
12/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
13
12/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
14
12/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
15
01/08/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
01/08/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
03/09/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
17
03/09/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
18
03/11/2019
Request for Special Notice
19
03/28/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
20
03/28/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
21
03/28/2019
Certificate of Service
03/28/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
04/02/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
23
04/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
04/17/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
04/18/2019
Certificate of No Objection
25
04/18/2019
Certificate of Service
26
04/19/2019
Relief from Stay
27
04/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
04/23/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/23/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.