William Joseph Overstreet
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00345 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/10/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
10/10/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
10/10/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
10/10/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/11/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
7
10/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
8
10/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
10/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10
10/18/2018
Excepted from Electronic Filing
11
10/19/2018
Order to be Excepted from Electronic Filing
12
10/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
10/26/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
11/16/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
11/27/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix AND Amended Schedules (Fee)
11/27/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
11/29/2018
Clerks Notice of Fees Due (Not Deferred)
16
11/29/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
11/29/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
12/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/06/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
12/11/2018
Schedule A/B (Form 106A/B & 206A/B)
19
12/11/2018
Declaration About Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec and 202)
01/02/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
01/02/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
21
01/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
22
01/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
23
01/08/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
24
01/08/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
01/09/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
01/14/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
26
01/15/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
27
01/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
01/18/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.