William M Butler and Jacqueline C Butler
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80155 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
37
10/27/2018
Limit Notice
52
12/20/2018
Modification of Plan (All Chapters)
53
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
59
01/23/2019
Limit Notice
65
01/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.