William Michael Johnson and Mary Ann Johnson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00147 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/06/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
05/06/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
05/06/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
05/06/2019
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
05/06/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/06/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
05/06/2019
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
05/07/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/07/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/07/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/07/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
05/07/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
10
05/08/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
11
05/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
05/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
05/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
14
05/10/2019
Amended Schedules D E/F (Fee)
15
05/10/2019
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.