William Wayne Blixt
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00343 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/09/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
10/09/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
10/09/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/10/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
4
10/10/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
5
10/10/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
6
10/10/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
7
10/10/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
8
10/10/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
9
10/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
10
10/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
10/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
10/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
10/22/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
14
10/22/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
15
10/22/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
16
10/22/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
17
10/23/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
18
10/23/2018
Affidavit of Service
10/23/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
11/29/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
20
11/29/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
11/29/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.