Willie Able Wilson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2016-bk-04340 (alnb)

Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES (Claim No. 2) To ECAST SETTLEMENT CORPORATION. Fee Amount $25 Filed by Creditor ECAST SETTLEMENT CORPORATION.

B2100A (Form 2100A) (12/15) BL9295637 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, BIRMINGHAM DIVISION In re WILLIE ABLE WILSON Case No. 16-04340-13 TRANSFER OF CLAIM OTHER THAN FOR SECURITY A CLAIM HAS BEEN FILED IN THIS CASE or deemed filed under 11 U.S.C. § 1111(a). Transferee hereby gives evidence and notice pursuant to Rule 3001(e)(2), Fed R. Bankr. P., of the transfer, other than for security, of the claim referenced in this evidence and notice. eCAST Settlement Corporation CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES Name of Transferee Name of Transferor Name and Address where notices to transferee should be sent: Court Claim # (if known): 2 eCAST Settlement Corporation Amount of Claim: $14,991.00 c/o Becket & Lee LLP PO Box 3002 Date Claim Filed: 11/8/2016 Malvern, PA 19355-1245 Email: proofofclaim@becket-lee.com Email: Phone: 610-228-2570 Phone: Last Four Digits of Acct #: 1744 Last Four Digits of Acct #: 1744 Last Four of Alternate Acct #: Last Four of Alternate Acct #: Name and Address where transferee payments should be sent (if different from above): eCAST Settlement Corporation PO Box 29262 New York, NY 10087-9262 Email: payments@becket-lee.com Phone: Last Four Digits of Acct #: 1744 Last Four of Alternate Acct #: I declare under penalty of perjury that the information provided in this notice is true and correct to the best of my knowledge and belief. By: /s/ Christopher Cramer Date: 1/24/2018 Christopher S Cramer, Claims Administrator Becket & Lee LLP Penalty for making a false statement: Fine of up to $500,000 or imprisonment for up to 5 years, or both. 18 U.S.C. §§ 152 & 3571. Case 16-04340-TOM13 Doc 42 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/24/18 07:31:48 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 267 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/19/2016
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Willie Able Wilson
2
10/19/2016
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Willie Able Wilson.
4
10/19/2016
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Willie Able Wilson.
5
10/19/2016
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Willie Able Wilson.
10/19/2016
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(16-04340-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19940104. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/19/2016
Tax Documents for the Year for 2015 Filed by Debtor Willie Able Wilson.
7
10/19/2016
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/16/2016 at 10:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/06/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 02/14/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 04/17/2017 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 01/17/2017.
8
10/20/2016
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10/20/2016
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Willie Able Wilson Case Number 11-04411, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/01/2011, Standard Discharge on 02/23/2016; Case Number 04-09477, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 10/27/2004, Dismissed for Other Reason on 07/05/2005; Case Number 06-05165, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 12/20/2006, Dismissed for failure to pay filing fee on 07/30/2008; Case Number 05-07263, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 08/01/2005, Dismissed for Other Reason on 12/06/2006; Case Number 96-05107, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 07/26/1996, Standard Discharge on 01/05/1998.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
10/21/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 10/21/2016.
10
10/22/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Willie Able Wilson). Notice Date 10/22/2016.
11
10/22/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 10/22/2016.
12
10/24/2016
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
13
11/01/2016
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial.
14
11/16/2016
Trustee's Notice Continuance of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/30/2016 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. (Ch13troffice, sc)
15
12/01/2016
Meeting of Creditors Held 11/30/2016. (Ch13troffice, jc)
16
12/02/2016
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
17
12/05/2016
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Willie Able Wilson.
18
12/05/2016
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 12/6/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (TOM) Birmingham.
19
12/07/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 18 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/07/2016.
20
12/08/2016
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 12/8/2016 (RE: related document(s) 7 Confirmation Hearing, 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 12/22/2016 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
21
12/10/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 12/10/2016.
22
12/22/2016
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
23
01/04/2017
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan. Trustees Objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed on 1/4/2017 (RE: related document(s) 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss).
24
01/06/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 01/06/2017.
25
01/30/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial
26
01/30/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (RE: related document(s) 25 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
01/30/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(16-04340-TOM13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20299087. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 25) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
01/31/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Allan Trippe, Attorney for AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (RE: related document(s) 25 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial). Hearing scheduled 2/23/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
29
02/02/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 27 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 02/02/2017.
30
02/24/2017
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/23/2017 10:39:26 AM ]. File Size [ 83 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:14 ]. (RE: Doc #25; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Allan Trippe, Attorney for AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial). (adiuser).
31
02/28/2017
Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 25) Signed on 2/28/2017. (AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial)
32
03/02/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 31 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 03/02/2017.
33
08/23/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
34
10/04/2017
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, ct)
35
10/06/2017
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s) 34 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 10/30/2017 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
36
10/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 35 Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 10/08/2017.
37
10/25/2017
Consent to Action at Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Debtor Willie Able Wilson (RE: related document(s) 34 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
38
10/26/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 37 Consent to Action at Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss filed by Debtor Willie Able Wilson). Hearing scheduled 10/30/2017 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
39
10/31/2017
Bench Sheet: (RE: related document(s) 34 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
40
11/01/2017
Order Conditionally Denying Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Related Doc # 34) Signed on 11/1/2017.
41
11/03/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 40 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Notice Date 11/03/2017.
42
01/24/2018
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES (Claim No. 2) To ECAST SETTLEMENT CORPORATION. Fee Amount $25 Filed by Creditor ECAST SETTLEMENT CORPORATION.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.