Willie L Taylor and Mary J Taylor
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80068 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
63
01/04/2019
Limit Notice
65
01/07/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
01/29/2019
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change
68
02/24/2019
Transfer of Claim
02/24/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.