Wilma Laverne Roskelley
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00347 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/11/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
10/11/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
10/11/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
10/11/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
10/11/2018
Declaration
10/12/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
10/12/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10/12/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/12/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
7
10/12/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
8
10/12/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
9
10/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
10/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
10/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
10/15/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
13
10/26/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
11/16/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Statement of Presumed Abuse (ST1) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Statement of Declination (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
11/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - USTs Statement of Presumed Abuse

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.