Wilson Maniego Nabong
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00178 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/11/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
06/11/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
06/11/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
06/11/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
06/11/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
5
06/11/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
06/11/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
06/11/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
7
06/11/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
8
06/11/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
9
06/11/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
10
06/12/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
11
06/12/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12
06/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
13
06/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
14
06/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
15
06/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
16
06/29/2018
Request for Special Notice
17
07/03/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
07/10/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
07/12/2018
Amended Schedules D E/F (Fee)
07/12/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
07/16/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
20
07/20/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
21
07/20/2018
Convert Case From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (Fee) (CM11)
07/23/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
07/23/2018
Convert Case From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (BKCONV01)
07/23/2018
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
07/24/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
27
07/24/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
28
07/24/2018
BR1019 Report of Post Petition Debts
29
07/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
30
07/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
31
07/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
32
07/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
33
07/27/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
34
07/30/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
35
07/30/2018
Withdrawal of Claim
08/07/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
08/14/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
08/28/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
08/30/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
38
08/31/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
39
09/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
40
09/24/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
41
09/25/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
42
09/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
43
09/28/2018
Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)
09/28/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
10/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.