Wilson et al v. Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00195 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 163 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
2
08/29/2016
Civil Cover Sheet.
12
12/06/2017
NOTICE of Election to Decline Intervention by United States of America
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
14
04/16/2018
SEALED ORDER by Judge Timothy M. Burgess. The complaint be unsealed and served upon the defendant by the relator. See Order for additional instruction regarding sealed document. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 4/16/18.
15
06/21/2018
AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium, filed by Joan Wilson, Paul Franke.
16
06/21/2018
AFFIDAVIT of Service for False Claims Act Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial and Civil Cover Sheet served on Loretta Lynch, Atty General for the U.S., U.S. Dept. of Justice on Oct. 3, 2016, filed by Paul Franke, Joan Wilson.
17
06/21/2018
Unissued summons re Defendant Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium.
06/21/2018
Summons Issued as to Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium. (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
06/28/2018
AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial and Summons served on Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium on June 27, 2018, filed by Paul Franke, Joan Wilson.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
19
07/02/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
07/09/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
08/15/2018
Amend/Correct
22
08/15/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
08/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
08/28/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
08/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
09/04/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
28
09/11/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
29
09/14/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
30
09/18/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
31
10/10/2018
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
32
10/12/2018
Disqualify Counsel
33
10/12/2018
Memorandum
34
10/12/2018
Affidavit
35
10/12/2018
Affidavit
36
10/12/2018
Affidavit
37
10/12/2018
Affidavit
38
10/12/2018
File Excess Pages
39
10/16/2018
Amend/Correct
40
10/18/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
41
10/23/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
10/26/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/26/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
10/30/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
10/31/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
11/16/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
11/26/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
11/28/2018
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
49
12/03/2018
Amended Complaint
50
12/03/2018
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
51
12/03/2018
Memorandum
52
12/03/2018
Affidavit
53
12/11/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
12/12/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.