Wilson v. Outback Steakhouse, et al
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:1997-cv-00259 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 635 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/28/1997
DEMAND for jury trial by H. Lee Wilson - STRIKING JURY DEMAND PER ORDER OF 7/14/97 (ydw) Modified on 07/14/1997
2
03/06/1997
SUMMONS issued for Outback Steakhouse, Ausie Restaurant Inc, Keith Burbank; summons and complaint mailed by cmrrr to named defendants
03/06/1997
File referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
03/10/1997
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of summons and complaint on illegible on 3/7/97 for Outback Steakhouse. Answer due on 3/27/97 for Outback Steakhouse
4
03/10/1997
Summons returned unexecuted as to Ausie Restaurant Inc with following notation: "Attempted, not know"; counsel notified (ydw) Modified on 03/11/1997
5
03/11/1997
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of summons and complaint on illegible on 3/8/97 for Keith Burbank. Answer due on 3/28/97 for Keith Burbank
6
03/31/1997
ANSWER to Complaint by Outback Steakhouse, Ausie Restaurant Inc (Attorney Dent M. Morton), referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
7
04/08/1997
ORDER, set Rule 16 Status Conference 8:00 4/23/97 before Judge Myron H. Thompson (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT, TW.
8
04/29/1997
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 11/5/97 before Judge Myron H. Thompson; Motion Filing deadline on 10/6/97 ; Discovery cutoff 10/22/97 ; jury trial set for 12/8/97 before Judge Myron H. Thompson ; set amended pleading deadline for 7/13/97; Jury selection set for 12/8/97; Mediation Notice deadline on 8/8/97 (w/AO 85 Form attached); (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to Tim, Marie and Brenda
10
06/20/1997
ORDER [9-1] motion to Strike [1-1] demand jury by H. Lee Wilson by Ausie Restaurant Inc, Outback Steakhouse set for submission on 7/7/97, setting Brief deadline to 7/7/97 (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel.
11
07/07/1997
MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Outback Steakhouse, Ausie Restaurant Inc in support of [9-1] motion to Strike [1-1] demand jury by H. Lee Wilson by Ausie Restaurant Inc, Outback Steakhouse; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
12
07/14/1997
ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Strike [1-1] demand jury by H. Lee Wilson; striking the demand for jury trial (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel.
13
08/20/1997
Witness list by H. Lee Wilson; referred to Judge Thompson.
14
08/25/1997
ORDER, resetting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 1/5/98 before Judge Myron H. Thompson ; (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to TW, MT and CC.
15
10/07/1997
ORDER, setting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference for 10:30 11/5/97 before Judge Myron H. Thompson Proposed Pretrial Order due 11/3/97 ; Jury Trial set for 1/5/98 before Judge Myron H. Thompson ; (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to TW and MT.
16
10/15/1997
Witness list by H. Lee Wilson; referred to Judge Thompson.
17
10/17/1997
JOINT MOTION by Outback Steakhouse, Ausie Restaurant Inc to extend deadlines in scheduling order ; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
18
10/22/1997
ORDER denying as untimely [17-1] joint motion to extend deadlines in scheduling order (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel.
19
10/28/1997
Report of Settlement Conference and Mediation filed by H. Lee Wilson, Outback Steakhouse, Ausie Restaurant Inc referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
20
10/31/1997
AMENDED REPORT OF Settlement Conference and Mediation filed by H. Lee Wilson; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
11/05/1997
Pre-Trial Conference held before Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/5/97 (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
11/06/1997
PRETRIAL ORDER setting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Non-jury trial set for 10:00 1/26/98 before Judge Myron H. Thompson ; that the parties are to file their proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law by 1/21/98; that each party shall have available at the time of trial, for use by the court, three copies of the list of his or her exhibits; All trial exhibits must be "pre-marked" by the courtroom deputy clerk three days before trial; that each party shall have available a sufficient number of copies of each photostatically reproducible exhibit for each of the opposing counsel, the courtroom deputy clerk, the law clerk, and the judge; that all understandings, agreements and stipulation contained in this pretrial order shall be binding on all parties unless an objection is noted and filed with the court within seven days from the date of this order; (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to TW and MT.
22
11/07/1997
ORDER, setting In Chambers Mediation Conference for 9:00 11/19/97, in Room 330 ; the attorneys who will try the case shall appear at the Settlement Mediation with the parties and with the person or persons having full authority to negotiate and to settle the case on any terms; five court days before the Settelement Conference, or by 11/14/97, the parties shall file directly with the undersigned Judge Confidential Settlement, which should not be filed with the Clerk of the Court, nor filed, nor served upon the other parties ; directing Counsel for the parties to confer before the mediation conference and exchange offers in an attempt to settle this case, and to bring with them to the conference evidentiary materials in support of their monetary demands or offers, which should not be filed with the Clerk of the Court, nor served upon the other parties; (signed by Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to SC and MT.
24
11/20/1997
ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Amend [21-2] pre-trial order (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel.
25
11/20/1997
ORDER in a mediation proceeding conducted on 11/19/97, the parties settled all of the plaintiff's claims in this action; terminated deadlines, setting Advise Court of Settlement deadline to 12/19/97 (signed by Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to TW and MT.
11/20/1997
File referred to Judge Thompson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
11/24/1997
ORDER that the jury selection and trial are continued generally; (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to TW, MT.
27
12/19/1997
STIPULATION of dismissal by H. Lee Wilson, Outback Steakhouse of Florida, Inc., and Aussie restaurant Management, Inc.; referred to Judge Thompson
12/19/1997
File referred to Judge Thompson (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
12/23/1997
ORDER dismissing this cause in its entirety with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs and attorney's fees, except as set forth in the release and settlement agreement executed by the parties; (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to TW, and MT
12/23/1997
Case closed (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.