Winterberg v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona

2:2017-cv-03922 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
21
05/16/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
22
05/17/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document
23
05/18/2018
Notice of Settlement
24
05/18/2018
Order
25
06/15/2018
Stipulation of Dismissal
26
06/19/2018
Order Dismissing Case
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.