Wright v. Macerich Westcor Management LLC
Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona

2:2009-cv-00710 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 552 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/07/2009
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 09700000000002716339, filed by Rita Wright.
1
Exhibit
2
Summons
3
Civil Cover Sheet
3 Attachments
04/07/2009
This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 09-00710-PHX-SRB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered by REK) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
04/07/2009
Notice re Magistrate Consent Form
3
04/07/2009
Summons Issued as to Macerich Westcor Management LLC. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print.
4
04/13/2009
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Wright. Macerich Westcor Management LLC served on 4/9/2009.
5
04/24/2009
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Rita Wright, Macerich Westcor Management LLC.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
6
04/28/2009
ORDER pursuant to 5 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Macerich Westcor Management LLC shall have to and including May 13, 2009 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/28/09.
7
05/12/2009
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Macerich Westcor Management LLC.
8
05/12/2009
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Macerich Westcor Management LLC.
9
06/02/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Rita Wright.
10
06/11/2009
REPLY in Support re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Macerich Westcor Management LLC.
11
08/03/2009
ORDER denying 8 Defendant Macerich Westcor Management, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Case. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/3/09.
12
08/05/2009
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set on 10/5/09 at 01:00 PM before Judge Susan R Bolton. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/5/09.
13
08/17/2009
ANSWER to Complaint by Macerich Westcor Management LLC.
14
09/25/2009
REPORT re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Rita Wright.
15
09/28/2009
Notice re Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure Statement by Macerich Westcor Management LLC
16
10/05/2009
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Scheduling Conference held on 10/5/09. Deadlines discussed and entered. Scheduling Order to follow. A copy of the Joint Proposed Pretrial Order is provided to counsel this date. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Lemke)
17
10/05/2009
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/23/2010. Dispositive motions due by 5/28/2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/25/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2010 at 09:00 AM before Judge Susan R Bolton. Bench Trial set for 11/9/2010 at 09:00 AM before Judge Susan R Bolton. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/5/09.
18
10/06/2009
Notice re Rule 34 Request for Entry Upon Land for Inspection and Other Purposes by Rita Wright
19
10/07/2009
Notice re Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Statement by Rita Wright
20
10/08/2009
Notice re Service of Discovery to Defendant by Rita Wright
21
11/05/2009
Notice re Service of Defendant Macerich Westcor Management, LLC's First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiff by Macerich Westcor Management LLC
22
11/05/2009
NOTICE of Deposition of Rita Wright, filed by Macerich Westcor Management LLC.
23
11/05/2009
NOTICE of Deposition of Ronald Roper, filed by Macerich Westcor Management LLC.
24
11/23/2009
Notice re Service of Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery Requests by Macerich Westcor Management LLC
25
12/07/2009
MOTION to Amend/Correct re Complaint by Rita Wright.
1
Exhibit Amended Complaint - Unmarked
2
Exhibit Amended Complaint - Marked
2 Attachments
26
12/08/2009
Notice re Amended Notice of Deposition of Rita Wright by Macerich Westcor Management LLC
27
12/08/2009
Notice re Service of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Discovery by Rita Wright
28
12/17/2009
NOTICE of Deposition of Paul S. Farber, filed by Macerich Westcor Management LLC.
29
12/18/2009
STIPULATION Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Complaint by Macerich Westcor Management LLC, Rita Wright.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
30
12/18/2009
ORDER - The Court having considered the 29 Stipulation Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Complaint, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Pla shall be permitted to file the Amended Complaint appended as Exhibit A to Pla's 25 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Pla's 25 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/18/09.
31
12/18/2009
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Macerich Westcor Management LLC, Macerich Management Company, TWC Chandler LLC, filed by Rita Wright.
32
01/07/2010
SEPARATE ANSWER to 31 Amended Complaint by Macerich Westcor Management LLC.
33
01/13/2010
Minute Order: Discovery Dispute Hearing set for 1/15/2010 at 02:30 PM before Judge Susan R Bolton. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
34
01/15/2010
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Discovery Dispute Hearing held on 1/15/2010 at the request of defense counsel re: disclosure of expert report. Discussion held. The Court's Rule 16 Order prohibits expert depositions until both sides have disclosed their expert reports. If the expert report lists substantially greater number of barriers than that alleged in the complaint, counsel should agree to a later disclosure of defendant's expert report so Plaintiff has enough time to file a responsive report. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Lemke)
35
01/20/2010
SUMMONS Submitted by Rita Wright
36
01/20/2010
SUMMONS Submitted by Rita Wright
37
01/21/2010
Summons Issued as to Macerich Management Company, TWC Chandler LLC. *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print.
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02515274419" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02515274419','436281','97','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Summons)
1 Attachment
38
01/25/2010
Notice re Service of First Set of Supplemental Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Macerich Westcor Management LLC
39
01/29/2010
Notice re Service Of Plaintiffs Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Rita Wright
40
02/26/2010
Notice re Service of Expert Witness Disclosure by Macerich Westcor Management LLC
41
06/23/2010
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Rita Wright.
1
Text of Proposed Order Order for Dismissal
1 Attachment
42
06/24/2010
ORDER pursuant to 41 Stipulation of Dismissal, dismissing the Amended Complaint with prejudice with each party to bear his, her or its own attorneys' fees and costs. The Court will retain jurisdiction until February 1, 2012 solely for the purpose of enforcing the parties' settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 06/24/10.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.