Wright v. Walmart, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00295 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/17/2018
Notice of Removal
2
12/17/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
12/17/2018
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
4
12/27/2018
Notice of Service List
5
12/27/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
6
12/31/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
7
12/31/2018
Order
8
01/04/2019
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
9
01/11/2019
Answer to Complaint
10
01/11/2019
Jury Demand
11
01/24/2019
Proposed Pretrial Order
12
01/25/2019
Scheduling Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.