Wynn v. Davison Design & Development, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

1:2009-cv-00790 (alsd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 475 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/08/2009
COMPLAINT against DAVISON DESIGN & DEVELOPEMENT (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 11290000000001399450.), filed by Sondra Wynn. [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/3/2009.]
1
Exhibit A-B
2
Summons
2 Attachments
2
10/08/2009
CIVIL COVER SHEET. [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/3/2009.]
3
10/09/2009
Summons Issued as to DAVISON DESIGN & DEVELOPEMENT. (djb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/3/2009.]
4
10/21/2009
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SONDRA WYNN [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/3/2009.]
1
Exhibit Proof of Service
1 Attachment
5
10/27/2009
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT - Re: 4 Certificate of Service filed by SONDRA WYNN - Counsel is advised by this entry that the incorrect event code was used. The correct event code is "Summons Returned Executed", which is located under Initial Pleadings and Service, Service of Process. In future, please use the correct event or if you need guidance, contact the clerk's office. (laj) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/3/2009.]
10/27/2009
Reset Deadline - DAVISON DESIGN & DEVELOPEMENT's Answer due 11/2/2009 - pursuant to 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/Notice of Filing Proof of Service. (laj) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/3/2009.] (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/27/2009
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SONDRA WYNN. DAVISON DESIGN & DEVELOPEMENT served on 10/13/2009, answer due 11/2/2009. [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/3/2009.]
7
11/02/2009
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND SUPPORT by DAVISON DESIGN & DEVELOPEMENT. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/20/2009). [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/3/2009.]
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
3 Attachments
8
11/02/2009
RULE 7.1(B) CONFERENCE STATEMENT re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND SUPPORT by DAVISON DESIGN & DEVELOPEMENT. [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/3/2009.]
11/03/2009
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: Proposed initial scheduling order. (djb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/3/2009.] (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
11/16/2009
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND SUPPORT filed by SONDRA WYNN. [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/3/2009.]
1
Exhibit A-F
1 Attachment
11/17/2009
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND SUPPORT, 9 Memorandum in Opposition (djb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/3/2009.] (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
11/20/2009
Request Order Allowing a Reply to Memorandum in Opposition by DAVISON DESIGN & DEVELOPMENT INC. [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/3/2009.]
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
11
11/23/2009
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE to counsel JOHN KVARTEK, Re 10 Request/Demand filed by DAVISON DESIGN & DEVELOPMENT INC. The referenced document has been filed incorrectly. To insure the accuracy of the docket and proper reporting you should re-file this document using the correct event selection which is found under "Motions and Related Filings". (djb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/3/2009.]
12
11/23/2009
MOTION Request for Order Allowing a Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction re 9 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by DAVISON DESIGN & DEVELOPMENT INC. [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/3/2009.]
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
11/23/2009
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: 12 MOTION Request for Order Allowing a Reply to 9 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (djb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/3/2009.] (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
11/23/2009
ORDER The requested relief is GRANTED. Limited to 7 pages and due November 30, 2009. 12 MOTION Request for Order Allowing a Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 11/23/2009. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/30/2009) (djb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/3/2009.]
14
11/30/2009
RESPONSE by DAVISON DESIGN & DEVELOPMENT INC re 9 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by DAVISON DESIGN & DEVELOPMENT INC. [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/3/2009.]
11/30/2009
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of District Judge M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: 14 Response to, 9 Memorandum in Opposition to 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (djb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/3/2009.] (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
12/01/2009
ORDER - Defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (doc. 7) is DENIED. The clerk is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama together with the complete court file. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 12/1/2009. (djb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 12/3/2009.]
16
12/03/2009
Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 3:09-cv-00446. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
12/03/2009
Answer due from Davison Design & Development, Inc. on 12/15/2009 pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. 12(a)(4)(A). (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
12/03/2009
Copy of Local Rule 3.4 and blank Disclosure Statement form e-mailed to Defendant Davison Design & Development, Inc.; Disclosure Statement Due 12/10/2009.
18
12/03/2009
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/19/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 12/3/2009. (Attachment: #(1) consent form)
19
12/11/2009
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Motion for Enlargement of Time) by Davison Design & Development, Inc.
20
12/14/2009
This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady. To ensure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix WS-C after the case number on all future pleadings.
21
12/14/2009
ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due from Davison Design & Development, Inc. on 12/29/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/14/2009.
22
12/16/2009
Order, Dft Davison Design & Development, Inc. is to file its required disclosure statement on or before 12/23/2009 or SHOW CAUSE by that date why it is not able to comply w/LR 3.4. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/16/09. (Attachment: # 1 Blank Disclosure Statement)
23
12/17/2009
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Davison Design & Development, Inc.
24
12/17/2009
Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement 23 filed by Davison Design & Development, Inc.
25
12/18/2009
APPLICATION for Martin Bruce Sipple to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sondra Wynn with certificate of good standing attached Referred to Judge William E. Cassady.
26
12/22/2009
MOTION for Martin B. Sipple to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sondra Wynn.
27
12/22/2009
ENDORSED ORDER granting 25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, adjudged and decreed that counselor Martin Bruce Sipple, as a member in good standing of the Bar of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida be and is hereby admitted pro hac vice to serve the interests of justice in the above-entitled cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 12-22-09.
28
12/29/2009
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Davison Design & Development, Inc.
29
12/29/2009
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial Judgment) by Davison Design & Development, Inc.
30
01/04/2010
Order re: Dft's 29 MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. Motion to be taken under submission on 1/29/2010. Plf's response due by 1/21/2010; Dft's reply due by 1/28/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/4/10.
31
01/06/2010
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
32
01/06/2010
Notice of Filing Interrogatories and Request for Production filed by Davison Design & Development, Inc.
33
01/07/2010
NOTICE of Endorsement by Davison Design & Development, Inc.
34
01/07/2010
Order, unless Attny Kvaratek files for admission on or before 1/21/2010 he will be removed from the docket of this action. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/7/10. (Attachment: # 1 Requirements for Attorney Admission) (Mailed to Attny Kvartek on 1/8/10) (tot) Modified on 1/8/2010
35
01/11/2010
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2011 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade. Amended Pleadings due by 5/3/2010. Discovery cutoff 9/17/2010. Motions due by 10/1/2010. Jury Selection set for 3/1/2011 at 08:45 AM Trial will be set during the month of March 2011. ETT: 3-4 Days. Position Regarding Settlement due by 9/17/2010. The Rule 26(f) Report is to be supplemented NLT 1/25/10 to provide information re: ESI as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/11/10. (Attachment: # 1 Standing Order Governing Final Pretrial Conferences)
36
01/18/2010
MOTION for John M. Kvartek & Dennis K. Larry to Withdraw as Attorneys by Davison Design & Development, Inc. Modified on 1/19/2010
37
01/19/2010
ENDORSED ORDER granting 36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John M Kvartek and Dennis K. Larry terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 01/19/2010.
38
01/21/2010
Memorandum in Opposition re 29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial Judgment) filed by Sondra Wynn.
39
01/26/2010
Supplement to 31 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
40
01/27/2010
SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING ORDER re: 39 Supplement to Rule 26(f) Report. The parties have agreed upon the scope of ESI as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/27/10.
41
01/28/2010
Brief re 29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial Judgment) (Reply Brief).
42
01/29/2010
Notice of Filing Rule 26 Disclosures by Davison Design & Development, Inc. Modified on 2/1/2010
43
02/05/2010
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery by Davison Design & Development, Inc.
44
02/05/2010
ORDER GRANTING the parties' 43 Joint Motion for Extension of Time, & the parties are granted an extension of time up to & including 2/26/10 to prepare responses to all outstanding written discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 2/5/10.
45
02/12/2010
STIPULATION as to Protective Order by Davison Design & Development, Inc., Sondra Wynn.
46
02/17/2010
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 2/17/10.
47
02/19/2010
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, recommending that defendant's 29 MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings be granted in part and denied in part. Objections to R&R due by 3/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 02/19/2010.
48
02/26/2010
Notice of Filing Defendant's Discovery Responses filed by Davison Design & Development, Inc.
49
03/04/2010
STIPULATION Regarding Confidentiality by Davison Design & Development, Inc.
50
03/05/2010
Objection to Magistrate Judge's Recommendation and Supporting Brief filed by Davison Design & Development, Inc.
51
03/08/2010
ORDER ADOPTING 47 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/8/10.
52
03/08/2010
JUDGMENT that Dft's 29 Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings be GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART. Motion is DENIED to the extent it is directed to Count II & is GRANTED to the extent it is directed to Count III. Plf's unjust enrichment claim (Count III) is DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/8/10.
53
09/07/2010
STIPULATION for Entry of Judgment by Davison Design & Development, Inc.
54
09/07/2010
Order Resetting Pretrial Conferences in Civil Cases, Pretrial Conference RESCHEDULED for 2/15/2011 at 10:30 AM in US Courthouse, Judge's Chambers. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 09/07/2010.
55
09/07/2010
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear his or its own costs. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 09/07/2010.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.