Yamasheeta D Turner
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81384 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/22/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing
doc
06/02/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate
36
07/20/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan
50
03/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
51
03/19/2019
Limit Notice
52
03/20/2019
Limit Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.