Yell v. Daniels et al (mag+)
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:2013-cv-00336 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 631 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/20/2013
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt No. 4602027205 Filing fee $ 5.), filed by David B. Yell.
1
Affidavit
2
fee receipt
2 Attachments
2
05/20/2013
MEMORANDUM of law in Support re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by David B. Yell.
3
05/23/2013
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Terry F. Moorer for action or recommendation on all pretrial matters. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 5/23/13.
4
06/07/2013
ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before 6/27/2013, as further set out in order. Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/copies of petition to Warden Leeposey Daniels & Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 6/7/13.
5
06/12/2013
Return Receipt Card showing service of petition, brief, and order of procedure signed by Givner for Luther Strange served on 6/10/2013, answer due 6/27/2013.
6
06/12/2013
Return Receipt Card showing service of petition, brief, and order of procedure signed by Lisa Rudolph for Leeposey Daniels served on 6/8/2013, answer due 6/27/2013.
7
06/27/2013
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Leeposey Daniels, Luther Strange.
8
06/27/2013
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Leeposey Daniels, Luther Strange.
9
06/27/2013
ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; defendants' Answer shall be filed on or before 7/18/2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 6/27/13.
10
07/18/2013
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Leeposey Daniels, Luther Strange.
11
07/19/2013
ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of time and defendants' answer shall be filed on or before 8/9/2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 7/19/13.
12
08/09/2013
ANSWER to Complaint by Leeposey Daniels, Luther Strange.
1
Exhibit A - Indictment
2
Exhibit B - Case Action Summary
3
Exhibit C - Plea of Guilt Agreement
4
Exhibit D - Rule 32 petition
5
Exhibit E - Supplement to Rule 32 petition
6
Exhibit F - Second Amended Rule 32 petition
7
Exhibit G - State's Response to Second Amended Rule 32 petition
8
Exhibit H - Order denying Rule 32 petition
8 Attachments
13
01/13/2014
ORDER directing Yell TO SHOW CAUSE as to why his 1 Federal Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus should not be denied as untimely filed. Show Cause Response due by 2/3/2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/13/2014.
14
02/03/2014
RESPONSE to State's Argument for Summary Disposition filed in response to 13 Order to show cause filed by David B. Yell. Modified on 2/4/2014 to reflect actual title and to create link to Doc. 13.
15
06/27/2014
RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that: 1. The 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by David B. Yell on 5/20/2013, be denied as it was not filed within the one-year period of limitation mandated by 28 U.S.C. § 2244(d)(1). 2. This case be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 7/14/2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 6/27/2014.
16
07/14/2014
Objection to re 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by David B. Yell filed by David B. Yell.
17
09/22/2014
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Respondents file a response to the Petitioner's 16 Objections to Magistrate's Recommendation on or before 10/14/2014. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/22/2014.
18
10/14/2014
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Petitioner's Objections To Magistrate Judge's Recommendation by Leeposey Daniels, Luther Strange.
10/15/2014
AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Leeposey Daniels, Luther Strange. (NO PDF attached) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
10/15/2014
TEXT ORDER granting 18 Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Petitioner's 16 Objections to Magistrate Judge's 15 Recommendation. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 10/15/2014. (NO PDF attached)
20
11/03/2014
RESPONSE to [ 16 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation filed by Leeposey Daniels, Luther Strange. Modified on 11/4/2014 to reflect actual title and to create link to Doc. 16.
21
11/12/2014
ORDER as follows: 1. Petitioner's 16 Objections are OVERRULED. 2. The court ADOPTS the 15 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. 3. This 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED, as it was not filed within the one-year period of limitation mandated by 28 U.S.C. § 2244(d)(1). 4. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/12/2014.
22
11/12/2014
FINAL JUDGMENT is entered in favor of the Respondents, Leeposey Daniels and Luther Strange, and against the Petitioner, David B. Yell, and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/12/2014.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.