Yolanda Venae Harris
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2012-bk-01539 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 327 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/29/2012
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $281 Filed by Yolanda Venae Harris
3
03/29/2012
Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Yolanda Venae Harris.
4
03/29/2012
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Yolanda Venae Harris.
5
03/29/2012
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Yolanda Venae Harris.
03/29/2012
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(12-01539-13) [misc,volp13] (281.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 13196734. Fee Amount 281.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
03/29/2012
Tax Documents for the Year for 2011 Filed by Debtor Yolanda Venae Harris.
7
03/29/2012
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Yolanda Venae Harris.
8
03/30/2012
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
9
03/30/2012
For cause, it is ordered that the foregoing case is to be reassigned and transferred from Judge Thomas B Bennett to Judge Benjamin G Cohen.
10
03/29/2012
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/25/2012 at 09:30 AM at Room 448 Birmingham. Confirmation hearing will be set at a later date. Proof of Claim due by 07/24/2012. Government Proof of Claim due by 09/25/2012 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 06/25/2012.
11
03/30/2012
Notice of Confirmation Hearing (RE: related document(s) 10 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13) Southern Division). Confirmation hearing to be held on 5/22/2012 at 01:00 PM at 505 20th St N Ctrm 2 (BGC) Financial Ctr Birmingham.
12
03/30/2012
Composition Letter "pro rata"
13
04/01/2012
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 10) (RE: related document(s) 10 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13) Southern Division). Notice Date 04/01/2012.
14
04/01/2012
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 12) (RE: related document(s) 12 Letter). Notice Date 04/01/2012.
15
04/01/2012
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 7) (RE: related document(s) 7 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Yolanda Venae Harris). Notice Date 04/01/2012.
16
04/01/2012
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 8) (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/01/2012.
17
04/01/2012
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 11) (RE: related document(s) 11 Notice of Confirmation Hearing). Notice Date 04/01/2012.
18
04/10/2012
Return Mail: TARGET (RE: related document(s) 10 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13) Southern Division, 7 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Yolanda Venae Harris, 11 Notice of Confirmation Hearing).
19
04/26/2012
Meeting of Creditors Held 4/25/2012.
20
05/29/2012
Financial Management Course Certificate Filed Filed by Debtor Yolanda Venae Harris.
21
05/31/2012
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
22
06/13/2012
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 6/13/2012 (RE: related document(s) 11 Notice of Confirmation Hearing).
23
06/15/2012
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 22) (RE: related document(s) 22 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 06/15/2012.
24
12/04/2012
Trustee Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments.
25
12/05/2012
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s) 24 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 1/8/2013 at 09:30 AM at 505 20th St N Ctrm 2 (BGC) Financial Ctr Birmingham.
26
12/07/2012
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 25) (RE: related document(s) 25 Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 12/07/2012.
27
01/09/2013
Bench Sheet: (RE: related document(s) 24 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
28
01/09/2013
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Related Doc # 24) Signed on 1/9/2013.
29
01/11/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 28) (RE: related document(s) 28 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Notice Date 01/11/2013.
30
03/04/2014
Trustee Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments.
31
03/05/2014
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s) 30 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 4/1/2014 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 2 (BGC) Birmingham.
32
03/07/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 31 Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 03/07/2014.
33
04/01/2014
Bench Sheet: (RE: related document(s) 30 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
34
04/01/2014
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Related Doc # 30) Signed on 4/1/2014.
35
04/03/2014
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 34 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Notice Date 04/03/2014.
36
01/07/2015
Trustee's Motion to Modify Plan After Confirmation.
37
01/07/2015
Notice and Order on Trustee's Motion To Modify Confirmed Plan Increasing Plan Payments in the amount of $336.00 monthly. Signed on 1/7/2015 (RE: related document(s) 36 Trustee's Motion to Modify Plan).
38
01/09/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 37 Notice and Order on Trustee's Motion To Modify Confirmed Plan Increasing Plan Payments). Notice Date 01/09/2015.
39
01/26/2015
Motion for Relief from Stay and Certificate of Service, Fee Amount $176, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay, Filed by Creditor Branch Bank & Trust Company
1
Affidavit Affidavit #
2
Exhibit Loan Documents
2 Attachments
40
01/26/2015
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Branch Bank & Trust Company (RE: related document(s) 39 Motion for Relief from Stay and Certificate of Service, Fee Amount $176, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay,).
01/27/2015
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(12-01539-TOM13) [motion,mrlfsty] (176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 17585761. Fee Amount 176.00 (re:Doc# 39) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
01/27/2015
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Branch Banking & Trust Company (RE: related document(s) 39 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Branch Bank & Trust Company, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay). Hearing scheduled 2/19/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
43
01/29/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 41 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 01/29/2015.
44
02/17/2015
Courtroom Deputy Notes (Based on agreement of the parties, this matter is settled; a separate consent order will be submitted.) RE: Doc #39; Motion for Relief from Stay and Co-Debtor Stay filed by Michael J. McCormick, Attorney for Branch Banking & Trust Co.
45
02/20/2015
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Michael McCormick Filed by Creditor BRANCH BANKING & TRUST COMPANY.
46
03/12/2015
Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 39), Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Co-Debtor Stay (Related Doc # 39) Signed on 3/12/2015.
47
03/14/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 46 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 03/14/2015.
48
08/12/2015
Trustee's Motion to Modify Plan After Confirmation.
49
08/12/2015
Notice and Order Granting Trustee's Motion To Modify Confirmed Plan Increasing Plan Payments in the amount of $671.00 Monthly Signed on 8/12/2015 (RE: related document(s) 48 Trustee's Motion to Modify Plan).
50
08/14/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 49 Notice and Order on Trustee's Motion To Modify Confirmed Plan Increasing Plan Payments). Notice Date 08/14/2015.
51
10/11/2017
Trustee's Notice All unsecured claims have been paid in full. Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, mg)
52
11/02/2017
Debtor's Certifications Regarding Domestic Support Obligations and Section 522(q) for Debtor Filed by Debtor Yolanda Venae Harris.
53
01/11/2018
Trustee's Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment re: Rule 3002.1 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, th)
54
01/22/2018
Trustee's Certification of Plan Completion. (Ch13troffice, tt)
05/23/2018
Request for Trustee's Final Report (For Court Users Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/24/2018
Chapter 13 Trustee Final Report and Account

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.