Yonna L. Williams
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02140 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assign)
doc
05/23/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
05/23/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
25
02/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
03/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
30
03/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.