Yvonne J. McIntosh
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2015-bk-00103 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
57
06/19/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
06/19/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
06/19/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
59
06/19/2018
Certificate of Service
07/09/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
07/09/2018
Certificate of No Objection
61
07/11/2018
Relief from Stay
62
07/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/24/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
12/21/2018
Vacate
64
12/31/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
65
01/02/2019
Substitution of Attorney
66
01/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
01/03/2019
Terminate Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
01/07/2019
Proceeding Memo
68
01/07/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
69
01/07/2019
Affidavit
70
01/16/2019
Non-Opposition
71
01/30/2019
Vacate
72
02/01/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
73
02/26/2019
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.