Yvonne R Keller
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00003 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/04/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
01/04/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
01/04/2019
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
4
01/04/2019
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
01/04/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
01/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
01/07/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
01/07/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
10
01/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
11
01/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
01/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
13
01/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
14
01/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
01/28/2019
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
16
01/31/2019
Entry of Appearance
02/01/2019
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
02/08/2019
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
02/08/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
02/19/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
02/28/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
20
03/01/2019
Dismissing Case (SA)
21
03/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
22
03/05/2019
Proceeding Memo
03/05/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.