Zavacky v. Nabong
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90031 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/22/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
10/23/2018
Adversary Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
10/23/2018
Summons Issued
10/23/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/23/2018
Summons Service Executed
10/24/2018
QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
11/07/2018
Answer to Complaint (APANS01)
5
11/08/2018
Setting Scheduling and Planning Conference (Adv. Cases - Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
6
12/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
7
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
8
12/19/2018
Setting Trial (SA)
12/20/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
12/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10
03/25/2019
Witness List
11
03/25/2019
Extend Time
12
03/25/2019
Declaration
13
03/27/2019
Extend Time
14
03/29/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
04/01/2019
Trial Brief
16
04/01/2019
Exhibit List
17
04/10/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
18
04/10/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
19
04/10/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
20
04/12/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
21
04/18/2019
Proceeding Memo
22
04/19/2019
Continue / Reschedule Trial (SA)
23
04/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
24
04/22/2019
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.