Zipperer et al v. Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cv-00208 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
137
02/23/2018
ORDER granting 128 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 126 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 2/23/18.
159
05/01/2018
ORDER denying 143 Motion for Relief from Final Judgment. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 5/1/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
162
05/31/2018
USCA Order
163
12/10/2018
USCA Order
164
12/27/2018
USCA Mandate
165
03/06/2019
Application for Writ of Garnishment
166
03/06/2019
Writ of Garnishment
167
03/06/2019
Declaration
168
03/11/2019
Errata
03/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
Writ of Garnishment (Text entry; no document attached.)
170
03/27/2019
Returned/Undeliverable Mail
171
03/28/2019
Returned/Undeliverable Mail

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.