a minor et al v. Huntington Beach City School District et al
Court Docket Sheet

Central District of California

8:2019-cv-00027 (cacd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
2
01/07/2019
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
5
01/07/2019
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
10
01/08/2019
Appoint Guardian ad Litem
12
01/10/2019
Appoint Guardian ad Litem
16
02/14/2019
More Definite Statement
18
02/14/2019
Strike
19
02/14/2019
Declaration (Motion related)
20
02/14/2019
Seal Case
21
02/14/2019
Exhibit to Motion
22
02/14/2019
Exhibit to Motion
23
02/15/2019
Seal Case
24
02/20/2019
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
27
02/22/2019
Order
28
02/26/2019
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
29
02/26/2019
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
30
02/26/2019
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
31
02/26/2019
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
32
03/04/2019
Reply (Motion related)
33
03/04/2019
Reply (Motion related)
04/16/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/16/2019
Text Only Scheduling Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
04/16/2019
More Definite Statement

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.