v. Ligus et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00187 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/15/2018
Complaint
2
08/15/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
08/15/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
08/15/2018
Unissued Summons
4
08/15/2018
Complaint
5
08/15/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
08/16/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
7
09/11/2018
Order
8
09/18/2018
Notice (Other)
9
09/25/2018
Notice (Other)
10
10/22/2018
Answer to Complaint
11
11/08/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
12
12/06/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
13
02/12/2019
Stipulation
14
03/07/2019
Order on Stipulation

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.