v. Norton Sound Health Corporation et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00247 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/17/2018
Complaint
2
10/17/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
10/17/2018
Notice (Other)
4
10/17/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
10/25/2018
Order on Motion to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/30/2018
Order
11/02/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
11/05/2018
Order
11/05/2018
Case Transferred Out - District (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.